EP1912573 - SURGICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2012/52] |
Former [2011/09] | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | ||
Former [2010/03] | For all designated states Power Medical Interventions, LLC 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | ||
Former [2008/17] | For all designated states Power Medical Interventions, Inc. 2021 Cabot Boulevard West Langhorne, PA 19047 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHITMAN, Michael, P. 1544 River Road New Hope, PA 18938 / US | 02 /
DATUCK, Peter, A. 125 Elm Avenue Glenside, PA 19038 / US | [2008/17] | Representative(s) | Soames, Candida Jane, et al Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [2016/48] |
Former [2011/45] | Soames, Candida Jane, et al Edwards Wildman Innovations LLP 10 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EZ / GB | ||
Former [2009/48] | Soames, Candida Jane, et al Edwards Angell Palmer & Dodge Innovations LLP 10 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EZ / GB | ||
Former [2008/17] | Duxbury, Stephen, et al ARNOLD & SIEDSMA Pettenkoferstrasse 37 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06800427.4 | 26.07.2006 | [2008/17] | WO2006US29287 | Priority number, date | US20050191851 | 27.07.2005 Original published format: US 191851 | [2008/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007016290 | Date: | 08.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1912573 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1912573 | Date: | 30.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.10.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/072, // A61B17/29 | [2016/26] | CPC: |
A61B17/07207 (EP,US);
A61B17/068 (US);
A61B34/71 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00199 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00398 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00407 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0046 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00477 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00685 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07285 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2903 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2905 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2927 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2936 (EP,US);
A61B2034/742 (EP,US);
A61B2090/067 (EP,US);
A61B2090/306 (EP,US);
A61B34/70 (EP,US);
A61B90/90 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/17] | A61B17/068 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/48] |
Former [2008/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 27.02.2008 | BA | 27.02.2008 | HR | 27.02.2008 | MK | 27.02.2008 | RS | 27.02.2008 | Title | German: | CHIRURGISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2008/17] | English: | SURGICAL DEVICE | [2008/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF CHIRURGICAL | [2008/17] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2008 | Search fee paid | 27.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 26.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.11.2015 | 28.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 15.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16196613.0 / EP3153111 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.07.2006 | AT | 30.11.2016 | BE | 30.11.2016 | CY | 30.11.2016 | CZ | 30.11.2016 | DK | 30.11.2016 | EE | 30.11.2016 | ES | 30.11.2016 | FI | 30.11.2016 | IT | 30.11.2016 | LT | 30.11.2016 | LV | 30.11.2016 | MC | 30.11.2016 | NL | 30.11.2016 | PL | 30.11.2016 | RO | 30.11.2016 | SE | 30.11.2016 | SI | 30.11.2016 | SK | 30.11.2016 | TR | 30.11.2016 | BG | 28.02.2017 | GR | 01.03.2017 | IS | 30.03.2017 | PT | 30.03.2017 | LU | 26.07.2017 | CH | 31.07.2017 | LI | 31.07.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 26.07.2006 | |
AT | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CY | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
TR | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
LU | 26.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 26.07.2006 | |
AT | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CY | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
LU | 26.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 26.07.2006 | |
AT | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
LU | 26.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
LU | 26.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
LU | 26.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 30.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5312023 (GREEN DAVID T [US], et al) [X] 1-3,12 * column 23, line 18 - column 27, line 18 * * figures 52-63 * [Y] 16; | [Y]US2004094597 (WHITMAN MICHAEL P [US], et al) [Y] 16 * paragraph [0086] ** figure 21 *; | [X]US2004260335 (BRAUN MARCUS [DE]) [X] 1-3,12 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2005037329 (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US], et al) [X] 1-3,12 * page 21, line 10 - page 26, line 12 * * claim 1 * * figures 1,22-36 * | International search | [X]US5820009 (MELLING HUGH [US], et al); | [Y]US2002198554 (WHITMAN MICHAEL P [US], et al); | [Y]WO03077769 (POWER MED INTERVENTIONS INC [US]) | by applicant | US5312023 | US6793652 | US20010999546 | US20020099634 | US20030460291 |