EP1935096 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ADJUSTING DITHER IN A DELTA SIGMA MODULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ST-Ericsson SA Chemin du Champ-des-Filles 39 1228 Plan-les-Ouates / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/49] | For all designated states ST-Ericsson SA Chemin du Champ-des-Filles 39 1228 Plan-les-Ouates / CH | ||
Former [2009/50] | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2008/26] | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOMAYAJULA, Shyam S. 1505 Chasewood Drive Austin, Texas 78727 / US | [2008/26] | Representative(s) | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2008/49] | Birchenough, Lewis, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2008/33] | White, Andrew Gordon NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2008/26] | White, Andrew Gordon NXP Semiconductors IP Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06803893.4 | 20.09.2006 | [2008/26] | WO2006US36609 | Priority number, date | US20050242110 | 30.09.2005 Original published format: US 242110 | [2008/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007040989 | Date: | 12.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1935096 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1935096 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H03M3/02 | [2008/26] | CPC: |
H03M3/3287 (EP,US);
H03M3/458 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM DITHER-ANPASSEN IN EINEN DELTA-SIGMA-MODULATOR | [2008/26] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ADJUSTING DITHER IN A DELTA SIGMA MODULATOR | [2008/26] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'AJUSTER LA VIBRATION DANS UN MODULATEUR DELTA SIGMA | [2008/26] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/26] | 20.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.06.2010 | 08.06.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 05.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.12.2010 | BE | 29.12.2010 | CY | 29.12.2010 | CZ | 29.12.2010 | DK | 29.12.2010 | EE | 29.12.2010 | FI | 29.12.2010 | HU | 29.12.2010 | IT | 29.12.2010 | LT | 29.12.2010 | LV | 29.12.2010 | NL | 29.12.2010 | PL | 29.12.2010 | RO | 29.12.2010 | SE | 29.12.2010 | SI | 29.12.2010 | SK | 29.12.2010 | TR | 29.12.2010 | BG | 29.03.2011 | GR | 30.03.2011 | ES | 09.04.2011 | IS | 29.04.2011 | PT | 29.04.2011 | IE | 20.09.2011 | LU | 20.09.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
IT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
TR | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
IE | 20.09.2011 | ||
LU | 20.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
IT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
IE | 20.09.2011 | ||
LU | 20.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
IT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
IE | 20.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
IT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 29.12.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0308982 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,6-20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0040] - [0042] - [0046] - [0049] *; | [X]EP1335543 (BROADCOM CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,6-20* figures 1-3 *; | [X] - CHRIS BINAN WANG ET AL, "A 113-DB DSD AUDIO ADC USING A DENSITY-MODULATED DITHERING SCHEME", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (200301), vol. 38, no. 1, ISSN 0018-9200, pages 114 - 119, XP001223265 [X] 1-3,6-20 * pages 114-115; figures 3,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSSC.2002.806260 | by applicant | EP0308982 | EP1335543 | - WANG ET AL., "A 113-dB DSD Audio ADC Using a Density-Modulated Dithering Scheme", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, vol. 38, no. 1, pages 114 - 119 |