|
08.12.2022 |
Letter relating to the request for the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.2022 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
17 |
|
08.07.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.06.2022 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2022 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.05.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.2022 |
Claims |
Appeal |
9 |
|
02.05.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.2022 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
30.11.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.11.2021 |
F3011.2 Oral Proceedings: Summons VICO |
Appeal |
8 |
|
24.11.2021 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2021 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.08.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.08.2021 |
Claims |
Appeal |
9 |
|
24.08.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.08.2021 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
24.08.2021 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
14.04.2021 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
24.04.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
8 |
|
24.04.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.04.2020 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
11.03.2020 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2020 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.01.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
8 |
|
28.01.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
9 |
|
28.01.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.01.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
13.12.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.2019 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
10.12.2019 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.12.2019 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.2019 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.04.2015 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2014 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.2014 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.05.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
9 |
|
19.05.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
20 |
|
16.05.2014 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.05.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
9 |
|
15.05.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
20 |
|
12.02.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.01.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2014 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
14.01.2014 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2014 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.01.2014 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
14.01.2014 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.01.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.01.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2014 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2013 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.09.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
30.09.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
30.09.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2013 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
07.08.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
26.07.2013 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2013 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2013 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.03.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.03.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2011 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2011 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.07.2011 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2011 |
Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2011 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.05.2011 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2010 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2009 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
26.05.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
19.01.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.01.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2008 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2008 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.05.2008 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
26.05.2008 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.05.2008 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
26.05.2008 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.05.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.05.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
26.05.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2008 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.05.2008 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
15.05.2008 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
14.05.2008 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.05.2008 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
14.05.2008 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.05.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
14.05.2008 |
Fax request to enter the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.05.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2008 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.01.2008 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
11 |
|
18.01.2008 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.01.2008 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.01.2008 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
18.01.2008 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
18.01.2008 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
18.01.2008 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
18.01.2008 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.01.2008 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.01.2008 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.06.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
139 |
|
24.05.2007 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.05.2007 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.05.2007 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
54 |
|
16.05.2007 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.05.2007 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.05.2007 |
Abstract |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.05.2007 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
9 |
|
07.05.2007 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
07.05.2007 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
9 |
|
07.05.2007 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
07.05.2007 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
21.11.2006 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
21.11.2006 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
21.11.2006 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
27 |
|
21.11.2006 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
16 |
|
21.11.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |