blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1981826

EP1981826 - CONSTRUCTION PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  21.06.2019
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip04.09.2020Correction of patent specificationpublished on 07.10.2020  [2020/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KNAUF AQUAPANEL GmbH
Kipperstrasse 19
44147 Dortmund / DE
[2013/19]
Former [2008/43]For all designated states
Knauf Perlite GmbH
Kipperstrasse 19
44147 Dortmund / DE
Inventor(s)01 / KOSLOWSKI, Thomas
Schützengrund 3
44227 Dortmund / DE
 [2008/43]
Representative(s)Berkenbrink, Kai-Oliver, et al
Patentanwälte Becker & Müller
Turmstrasse 22
40878 Ratingen / DE
[2019/30]
Former [2012/04]Berkenbrink, Kai-Oliver, et al
Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Turmstrasse 22
40878 Ratingen / DE
Former [2008/43]Berkenbrink, Kai-Oliver, et al
Turmstrasse 22
40878 Ratingen / DE
Application number, filing date06806630.731.10.2006
[2008/43]
WO2006EP10459
Priority number, dateDE2006100589909.02.2006         Original published format: DE102006005899
[2008/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2007090445
Date:16.08.2007
Language:DE
[2007/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1981826
Date:22.10.2008
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2008/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1981826
Date:25.01.2012
Language:DE
[2012/04]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1981826
Date:24.07.2019
Language:DE
[2019/30]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP1981826
Date:07.10.2020
[2020/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.08.2007
ClassificationIPC:C04B20/10, C04B28/04
[2008/43]
CPC:
C04B28/04 (EP,US); B29C45/23 (EP,US); C04B14/185 (EP,US);
C04B20/1051 (EP,US); C04B2103/65 (EP,US); C04B2111/00612 (EP,US);
C04B2111/27 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
C04B14/185, C04B20/1051 (EP,US);
C04B28/04, C04B14/185, C04B14/28, C04B20/0076, C04B41/5079 (US,EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2019/30]
Former [2008/43]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesHR31.07.2008
RS31.07.2008
TitleGerman:BAUPLATTE[2008/43]
English:CONSTRUCTION PANEL[2008/43]
French:DALLE DE CONSTRUCTION[2008/43]
Entry into regional phase20.06.2008National basic fee paid 
20.06.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
20.06.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.06.2008Examination requested  [2008/43]
29.01.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.02.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.09.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.11.2011Fee for grant paid
10.11.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.01.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.10.2012  31.10.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Fermacell GmbH
Düsseldorfer Landstrasse 395
47259 Duisburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Dr. Solf & Zapf Patent- und Rechtsanwalts PartG mbB
Candidplatz 15
81543 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2012/49]
Opponent(s)01  19.10.2012  31.10.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Fermacell GmbH
Düsseldorfer Landstrasse 395
47259 Duisburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf
Candidplatz 15
81543 München / DE
29.11.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
15.03.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.10.2014Date of oral proceedings
22.12.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
11.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
20.04.2018Reply to a communication from the opposition division
11.09.2018Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
08.02.2019Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
18.02.2019Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
31.05.2019Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
13.06.2019Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition19.02.2015Appeal received No.  T0385/15
22.04.2015Statement of grounds filed
12.09.2017Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
12.09.2017Date of oral proceedings
21.09.2017Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
17.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
04.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
20.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU31.10.2006
CY25.01.2012
CZ25.01.2012
DK25.01.2012
EE25.01.2012
FI25.01.2012
IE25.01.2012
LT25.01.2012
LV25.01.2012
NL25.01.2012
RO25.01.2012
SE25.01.2012
SI25.01.2012
SK25.01.2012
BG25.04.2012
GR26.04.2012
ES06.05.2012
IS25.05.2012
PT25.05.2012
BE31.10.2012
CH31.10.2012
LI31.10.2012
LU31.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]CY25.01.2012
CZ25.01.2012
DK25.01.2012
EE25.01.2012
FI25.01.2012
IE25.01.2012
LT25.01.2012
LV25.01.2012
NL25.01.2012
RO25.01.2012
SE25.01.2012
SI25.01.2012
SK25.01.2012
BG25.04.2012
GR26.04.2012
ES06.05.2012
IS25.05.2012
PT25.05.2012
BE31.10.2012
CH31.10.2012
LI31.10.2012
LU31.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
Former [2013/35]CY25.01.2012
CZ25.01.2012
DK25.01.2012
EE25.01.2012
FI25.01.2012
IE25.01.2012
LT25.01.2012
LV25.01.2012
NL25.01.2012
RO25.01.2012
SE25.01.2012
SI25.01.2012
SK25.01.2012
BG25.04.2012
GR26.04.2012
ES06.05.2012
IS25.05.2012
PT25.05.2012
BE31.10.2012
CH31.10.2012
LI31.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
Former [2013/33]CY25.01.2012
CZ25.01.2012
DK25.01.2012
EE25.01.2012
FI25.01.2012
IE25.01.2012
LT25.01.2012
LV25.01.2012
NL25.01.2012
RO25.01.2012
SE25.01.2012
SI25.01.2012
SK25.01.2012
BG25.04.2012
GR26.04.2012
ES06.05.2012
IS25.05.2012
PT25.05.2012
CH31.10.2012
LI31.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
Former [2012/49]CY25.01.2012
CZ25.01.2012
DK25.01.2012
EE25.01.2012
FI25.01.2012
IE25.01.2012
LT25.01.2012
LV25.01.2012
NL25.01.2012
RO25.01.2012
SE25.01.2012
SI25.01.2012
BG25.04.2012
GR26.04.2012
IS25.05.2012
PT25.05.2012
Former [2012/48]CY25.01.2012
EE25.01.2012
FI25.01.2012
IE25.01.2012
LT25.01.2012
LV25.01.2012
NL25.01.2012
SE25.01.2012
BG25.04.2012
GR26.04.2012
IS25.05.2012
PT25.05.2012
Former [2012/47]CY25.01.2012
FI25.01.2012
IE25.01.2012
LT25.01.2012
LV25.01.2012
NL25.01.2012
BG25.04.2012
GR26.04.2012
IS25.05.2012
PT25.05.2012
Former [2012/41]CY25.01.2012
FI25.01.2012
LT25.01.2012
LV25.01.2012
NL25.01.2012
BG25.04.2012
GR26.04.2012
IS25.05.2012
PT25.05.2012
Former [2012/39]FI25.01.2012
LT25.01.2012
LV25.01.2012
NL25.01.2012
BG25.04.2012
GR26.04.2012
IS25.05.2012
PT25.05.2012
Former [2012/37]FI25.01.2012
LT25.01.2012
NL25.01.2012
BG25.04.2012
GR26.04.2012
IS25.05.2012
PT25.05.2012
Former [2012/36]LT25.01.2012
NL25.01.2012
BG25.04.2012
GR26.04.2012
IS25.05.2012
Former [2012/35]LT25.01.2012
NL25.01.2012
BG25.04.2012
IS25.05.2012
Former [2012/34]LT25.01.2012
IS25.05.2012
Former [2012/33]LT25.01.2012
Cited inInternational search[A]DE541439  (MICHAEL GROSKOPF) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [X]FR1524312  (CARBONISATION CHARBONS ACTIFS) [X] 1-3,6 * page 1, lines 44-53 *;
 [X]EP0282240  (SHUBOW CALVIN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-10 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0681998  (US GYPSUM CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7,10 * the whole document *;
 [AD]EP0829459  (KRAEMER WALTER [DE]) [AD] * the whole document *;
 [X]WO03022776  (NEWCON INTERNAT LTD [CN], et al) [X] 1,3-6 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1367189  (KNAUF PERLITE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE102004002560  (KNAUF PERLITE GMBH [DE]) [A] * the whole document *
by applicantDE3115758
 EP0282240
 DE19804325
 WO03022776
OppositionDE1221387
 US3284980
 DE2930483
 DE3115758
 DE3420462
 DD233996
 DE3731993
 DE19804325
 WO0231287
 DE20023609U
 DE602004010235T
 DE60131748T
    - Auszug Zementtasschenbuch; Kapitel 'Zementarten' , S.19-26, 149-150
    - Auszug Zementtaschenbuch
    - HeidelbergCement, Betontechnische Daten, "Leichte Gesteinskörnungen", URL: www.beton-technische-daten.de/2/2_6.b.pdf
    - "Betonzusätze Zusatzmittel und Zusatzstoffe", Zement-Merkblatt Betontechnik, (20050900), vol. B3
    - 'Anlage 1' mit Versuchen zur Unterscheidbarkeit von Massehydrophobierung und Vorhydrophobierung ausgewählter Bestandteile
    - Anlage PI-1
    - Anlage PI-2
    - WINKLER, A., Herstellung von Mörteln mit Recyclingmaterialien und Entwicklung von Rezepturen für Ferigmortel
    - Fraunfofer Baufachinformationen; 'Bücher, Broschüren'
    - Anlage zu D19
    - 'SILRES BS 1042' Techn. Datenblatt, Überarbeitungsdatum 07.06.2013
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.