EP1948948 - GAS BEARING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2016 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2015/13] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECHTOLD, Mario Mozartstrasse 17 91334 Hemhofen / DE | 02 /
GROMOLL, Bernd Egerlandstrasse 34k 91083 Baiersdorf / DE | 03 /
NUNNINGER, Stefan Gebbertstr. 160 91058 Erlangen / DE | [2008/31] | Application number, filing date | 06807142.2 | 11.10.2006 | [2008/31] | WO2006EP67265 | Priority number, date | DE20051053801 | 09.11.2005 Original published format: DE102005053801 | [2008/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007054414 | Date: | 18.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1948948 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16C29/02, F16C33/10, F16C32/06 | [2008/31] | CPC: |
F16C32/0659 (EP,US);
F16C29/025 (EP,US);
F16C33/106 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/31] | Title | German: | GASLAGER | [2008/31] | English: | GAS BEARING | [2008/31] | French: | PALIER A GAZ | [2008/31] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/31] | 10.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/10] | 23.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.07.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IA]DE851279 (GENDRON FRERES SA) [I] 1,2,5,7,8,10-12 * figures 1,2 * * page 4, line 121 - page 5, line 4 * * page 5, lines 81-90 *[A] 9; | [XI]US4726689 (POLLOCK JOHN D [US]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 25; figures 1,2 * [I] 2-7,10-12; | [XI]US2003094059 (HIGUCHI AKIRA [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0090] - [0092]; figure 5 * [I] 2-7,10-12 | Examination | US2660484 |