EP1930452 - METAL MATRIX MATERIAL BASED ON SHAPE-MEMORY ALLOY POWDERS, PRODUCTION METHOD THEREOF AND USE OF SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSIDAD DEL PAIS VASCO-EUSKAL HERRIKO UNIBERSITATEA Barrio Sarriena 48940 Leioa / ES | [2019/02] |
Former [2008/24] | For all designated states UNIVERSIDAD DEL PAIS VASCO-EUSKAL HERRIKO UNIBERSITATEA Barrio Sarriena 48940 Leioa / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAN JUAN NUÑEZ, Jose Maria Barrio de Sarriena s/n·-UPV-Campus de Leioa E-48940 LEIOA (Vizcaya) / ES | 02 /
NÓ SÁNCHEZ, Maria Luisa Barrio de Sarriena s/n·-UPV-Campus de Leioa E-48940 LEIOA (Vizcaya) / ES | [2008/24] | Representative(s) | Balder IP Law, S.L. Paseo de la Castellana 93 5ª planta 28046 Madrid / ES | [2019/02] |
Former [2008/24] | Ungria Lopez, Javier, et al Avda. Ramón y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 06807938.3 | 30.08.2006 | [2008/24] | WO2006ES00493 | Priority number, date | ES20050002129 | 31.08.2005 Original published format: ES 200502129 | [2008/24] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007026039 | Date: | 08.03.2007 | Language: | ES | [2007/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1930452 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1930452 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 08.03.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C22C32/00, C22C1/04, C22C9/00, C22C1/02, B22F7/00, B22D19/14 | [2008/35] | CPC: |
B22D19/14 (EP,US);
C22C1/02 (ES);
C22C1/04 (ES);
C22C1/0425 (EP,US);
C22C1/1036 (EP,US);
C22C30/02 (EP,US);
C22C9/00 (EP,ES,US);
C22C9/01 (EP,US);
B22F2998/00 (EP,US);
B22F2998/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/00, B22F2207/01 (EP,US);
B22F2998/10, B22F1/00, B22F2201/20, B22F3/02, B22F3/04 (US,EP,ES);
B22F2998/10, B22F3/1283, B22F2201/20, B22F3/26 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2008/24] | C22C9/00, C22C1/02, C22C1/04, B22F7/00, B22D19/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/02] |
Former [2008/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METALLMATRIXMATERIAL BASIEREND AUF FORMSPEICHER-LEGIERUNGSPULVERN, PRODUKTIONSVERFAHREN DAVON UND VERWENDUNG | [2008/24] | English: | METAL MATRIX MATERIAL BASED ON SHAPE-MEMORY ALLOY POWDERS, PRODUCTION METHOD THEREOF AND USE OF SAME | [2008/24] | French: | MATERIAU COMPOSE D'UNE MATRICE METALLIQUE A BASE DE POUDRES D'ALLIAGE A MEMOIRE DE FORME ET SON PROCEDE D'OBTENTION ET D'UTILISATION | [2008/24] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2008 | Translation filed | 28.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2008 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/24] | 17.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 30.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/51] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 05.12.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 05.12.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.12.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 17.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.08.2006 | AT | 09.01.2019 | CY | 09.01.2019 | CZ | 09.01.2019 | DK | 09.01.2019 | EE | 09.01.2019 | FI | 09.01.2019 | GR | 09.01.2019 | IT | 09.01.2019 | LT | 09.01.2019 | LV | 09.01.2019 | MC | 09.01.2019 | NL | 09.01.2019 | PL | 09.01.2019 | RO | 09.01.2019 | SE | 09.01.2019 | SI | 09.01.2019 | SK | 09.01.2019 | TR | 09.01.2019 | BG | 09.04.2019 | IS | 09.05.2019 | PT | 09.05.2019 | IE | 30.08.2019 | LU | 30.08.2019 | BE | 31.08.2019 | CH | 31.08.2019 | LI | 31.08.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/30] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
CY | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
GR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
IE | 30.08.2019 | ||
LU | 30.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
CY | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
IE | 30.08.2019 | ||
LU | 30.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
IE | 30.08.2019 | ||
LU | 30.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
IE | 30.08.2019 | ||
LU | 30.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
LU | 30.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | NL | 09.01.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH1017959 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]US6346132 (HUBER ULRIKE [DE], et al); | [A] - KOZLOV A. ET AL., "Application of the high power ultrasonics for production of composite materials", METALLOFIZIKA I NOVEISHIE TEKHNOLOGII, (2001), vol. 23, pages 228 - 231, XP008077841 | by applicant | US6346132 |