EP1994728 - HEADSET WITH AMBIENT SOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Mobile Communications AB Nya Vattentornet 221 88 Lund / SE | [2014/29] |
Former [2008/48] | For all designated states Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB Nya Vattentornet 221 83 Lund / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOERSMA, Johan Brandgans 15 NL-7827 SG Emmen / NL | [2008/48] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 4289 203 14 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [2014/30] | Aurell, Henrik Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 4289 203 14 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [2008/48] | Aurell, Henrik Albihns AB P.O. Box 4289 203 14 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 06808829.3 | 06.09.2006 | [2008/48] | WO2006IB02460 | Priority number, date | US20060370349 | 08.03.2006 Original published format: US 370349 | [2008/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007102047 | Date: | 13.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1994728 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1994728 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/60, H04M1/05 | [2008/48] | CPC: |
H04R1/10 (EP,US);
H04B1/40 (KR);
H04M1/05 (EP,US);
H04M1/6058 (EP,US);
H04R1/1041 (EP,US);
H03G3/32 (EP,US);
H04R1/1016 (EP,US);
H04R2420/01 (EP,US);
H04R2420/07 (EP,US);
H04R5/033 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HEADSET MIT UMGEBUNGSSCHALL | [2014/10] | English: | HEADSET WITH AMBIENT SOUND | [2008/48] | French: | CASQUE AUTIO RESTITUANT LES SONS AMBIANTS | [2008/48] |
Former [2008/48] | HEADSET MIT UMGEBUNGSSCHALL | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/48] | 06.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 24.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.09.2006 | AT | 23.07.2014 | BE | 23.07.2014 | CY | 23.07.2014 | CZ | 23.07.2014 | DK | 23.07.2014 | EE | 23.07.2014 | ES | 23.07.2014 | FI | 23.07.2014 | IT | 23.07.2014 | LT | 23.07.2014 | LV | 23.07.2014 | MC | 23.07.2014 | PL | 23.07.2014 | RO | 23.07.2014 | SE | 23.07.2014 | SI | 23.07.2014 | SK | 23.07.2014 | TR | 23.07.2014 | IE | 06.09.2014 | LU | 06.09.2014 | CH | 30.09.2014 | FR | 30.09.2014 | LI | 30.09.2014 | BG | 23.10.2014 | GB | 23.10.2014 | GR | 24.10.2014 | IS | 23.11.2014 | PT | 24.11.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 06.09.2006 | |
AT | 23.07.2014 | ||
BE | 23.07.2014 | ||
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
IE | 06.09.2014 | ||
LU | 06.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GB | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
IE | 06.09.2014 | ||
LU | 06.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GB | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
IE | 06.09.2014 | ||
LU | 06.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GB | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
IE | 06.09.2014 | ||
LU | 06.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GB | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
LU | 06.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GB | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
LU | 06.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
LU | 06.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
LU | 06.09.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
LU | 06.09.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 23.07.2014 | |
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 23.07.2014 | |
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 23.07.2014 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0495653 (SOUNDOUT PTY LTD [ZA]) [Y] 2-5 * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 46; figures 3,4 *; | [YA]US5448637 (YAMAGUCHI NOBORU [JP], et al) [Y] 11,12 * column 4, line 62 - column 5, line L; figures 4,5 * [A] 14; | [A]EP1191770 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-26 * paragraphs [0098] - [0105]; figure 12 ** paragraphs [0035] - [0047] *; | [XYI]US2003118197 (NAGAYASU KATSUYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,6,7,9,21,24,26 * paragraph [0011] * * paragraphs [0032] - [0047]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 2-5,11,12 [I] 22,23 |