EP1949137 - A METHOD FOR HYDROCARBON RESERVOIR MAPPING AND APPARATUS FOR USE WHEN PERFORMING THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.09.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced Hydrocarbon Mapping AS Skogstøstraen 37 4029 Stavanger / NO | [2008/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARSUKOV, Pavel Longkruid 16 NL-3824 PD Amersfoort / NL | 02 /
FAINBERG, Eduard, B. Longkruid 16 NL-3824 PD Amersfoort / NL | 03 /
SINGER, Bension, Sh. Korporalstubben 8 A 4045 Hafrsfjord / NO | [2008/37] |
Former [2008/31] | 01 /
BARSUKOV, Pavel Longkruid 16 NL-3824 PD Amersfoort / NL | ||
02 /
FAINBERG, Eduard, B. Longkruid 16 NL-3824 PD Amersfoort / NL | |||
03 /
SINGER, Bension, Sh. 10 Balmoral Street East Victoria Park, Western Australia 6101 / AU | Representative(s) | Håmsø Patentbyrå AS P.O. Box 171 4301 Sandnes / NO | [2019/28] |
Former [2008/31] | Håmsø Patentbyrå ANS Postboks 171 4302 Sandnes / NO | Application number, filing date | 06812789.3 | 26.10.2006 | [2008/31] | WO2006NO00372 | Priority number, date | NO20050005168 | 03.11.2005 Original published format: NO 20055168 | [2008/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007053025 | Date: | 10.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1949137 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1949137 | Date: | 10.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 10.05.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01V3/08 | [2016/40] | CPC: |
G01V3/083 (EP,US);
G01V2003/084 (EP,US);
G01V2003/085 (EP,US);
G01V2003/086 (EP,US);
Y02A90/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/31] | G01V3/08, G01V3/15 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/28] |
Former [2008/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KOHLENWASSERSTOFFRESERVOIRABBILDUNG UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER AUSFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | [2008/31] | English: | A METHOD FOR HYDROCARBON RESERVOIR MAPPING AND APPARATUS FOR USE WHEN PERFORMING THE METHOD | [2008/31] | French: | PROCEDE DE CARTOGRAPHIE D'UN RESERVOIR D'HYDROCARBURE ET APPAREIL A UTILISER LORS DE LA MISE EN OEUVRE DU PROCEDE | [2018/41] |
Former [2008/31] | PROCEDE DE CARTOGRAPHIE DE RESERVOIRS D'HYDROCARBURES ET APPAREIL A UTILISER LORS DE LA MISE EN UVRE DU PROCEDE | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2008 | Search fee paid | 16.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 16.05.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/31] | 22.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 20.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   19.03.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.10.2006 | AT | 10.07.2019 | CY | 10.07.2019 | CZ | 10.07.2019 | DK | 10.07.2019 | EE | 10.07.2019 | ES | 10.07.2019 | FI | 10.07.2019 | IT | 10.07.2019 | LT | 10.07.2019 | LV | 10.07.2019 | MC | 10.07.2019 | NL | 10.07.2019 | PL | 10.07.2019 | RO | 10.07.2019 | SE | 10.07.2019 | SI | 10.07.2019 | SK | 10.07.2019 | TR | 10.07.2019 | BG | 10.10.2019 | GR | 11.10.2019 | LU | 26.10.2019 | BE | 31.10.2019 | CH | 31.10.2019 | FR | 31.10.2019 | LI | 31.10.2019 | IS | 10.11.2019 | PT | 11.11.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
CY | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
LU | 26.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
FR | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
LU | 26.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
FR | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
LU | 26.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
LU | 26.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
LU | 26.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 10.07.2019 | |
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 10.07.2019 | |
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | NL | 10.07.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US6603313 (SRNKA LEONARD J [US]) [X] 10,11,17 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 18 * * column 6, line 44 - column 7, line 25 * * column 8, line 49 - line 66 * * column 15, line 12 - line 62 * * figures 7, 9 * [A] 1-9 [Y] 12,15,16 [I] 13,14; | [YA]WO03104844 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [Y] 12 * page 3, line 28 - line 30 * * page 4, line 25 - page 5, line 13; figure 2 * [A] 11,13-17; | [Y]WO2004008183 (UNIV SOUTHAMPTON [GB], et al) [Y] 15,16 * page 22, line 11 * * figure 1a *; | [A]WO2004053528 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [A] 11-17 * page 12, line 23 - line 25 ** figure 1 * | International search | [A]WO0214906 (STATOIL ASA [NO], et al); | [A]US6603313 (SRNKA LEONARD J [US]); | [X]WO2004008183 (UNIV SOUTHAMPTON [GB], et al); | [A]WO2006003360 (OHM LTD [GB], et al) | by applicant | - CHAVE A.D.; COX C.S., "Controlled Electromagnetic Sources for Measuring Electrical conductivity Beneath the Oceans 1. Forward Problem and Model Study", JOURNAL OF GEOPHYSICAL RESEARCH, (1982), vol. 87, no. B7, pages 5327 - 5338 | - CHAVE A. D.; CONSTABLE S.C.; EDWARDS R.N., Electrical Exploration Methods for the Seafloor, (1991), pages 931 - 966 | - CHEESMAN S.J.; EDWARDS R.N.; CHAVE A.D., "On the theory of sea floor conductivity mapping using transient electromagnetic systems", GEOPHYSICS, (1987), vol. 52, no. 2, pages 204 - 217 | - CHEW W.C.; WEEDON W.H., "A 3D perfectly matched medium from modified Maxwell's equations with stretched coordinates", IEEE MICROWAVE AND GUIDED WAVE LETTERS, (1994), vol. 4, pages 268 - 270 | - COX C.S.; CONSTABLE S.C.; CHAVE A.D.; WEBB S.C., "Controlled source electromagnetic sounding of the oceanic lithosphere", NATURE, (1986), vol. 320, pages 52 - 54 | - CONSTABLE S.C.; ORANGE A.S.; HOVERSTEN G.M.; MORRISON H.F, "Marine magnetotellurics for petroleum exploration. Part 1: A sea floor equipment system", GEOPHYSICS, V., (1998), vol. 63, no. 3, pages 816 - 825 | - COGGON J. H.; MORRISON. H. F., "Electromagnetic investigation of the sea floor", GEOPHYSICS, V., (1970), vol. 35, pages 476 - 489 | - EDWARDS R. N.; LAW, L. K.; DELAURIER, J. M., "On measuring the electrical conductivity of the oceanic crust by a modified magnetometric resistivity method", J. GEOPHYS, (1981), vol. 68, pages 11609 - 11615 | - EDWARDS R.N.; NOBES D.C.; GOMEZ-TREVINO E., "Offshore electrical exploration of sedimentary basins: The ef fects of anisotropy in horizontally isotropic, layered media", GEOPHYSICS, V., (1984), vol. 49, no. 5, pages 566 - 576 | - EDWARDS R.N.; LAW L.K.; WOLFGRAM P. A.; NOBES D.C.; BONE M.N.; TRIGG D.F.; DELAURIER J.M., "First results of the MOSES experiment: Sea sediment conductivity and thickness determination. Bute Inlet, British Columbia, by magnetometric off-shore electrical sounding", GEOPHYSICS, (1985), vol. 450, no. 1, pages 153 - 160 | - EDWARDS R. N.; CHAVE A. D., "On the theory of a transient electric dipole-dipole method for mapping the conductivity of the sea floor", GEOPHYSICS, V., (1986), vol. 51, pages 984 - 987 | - EDWARDS R., "On the resource evaluation of marine gas hydrate deposits using sea-floor transient dipole-dipole method", GEOPHYSICS, V., (1997), vol. 62, no. 1, pages 63 - 74 | - EDWARDS R.N., "Two-dimensional modeling of a towed in-line electric dipole-dipole sea-floor electromagnetic system: The optimum time delay or frequency for target resolution", GEOPHYSICS, V., (1998), vol. 53, no. 6, pages 846 - 853 | - EIDESMO T.; ELLINGSRUD S.; MACGREGOR L.M.; CONSTABLE S.; SINHA M.C.; JOHANSEN S.E.; KONG N.; WESTERDAHL, H., "Sea Bed Logging (SBL), a new method for remote and direct identification of hydrocarbon filled layers in deepwater areas", FIRST BREAK, (200203), vol. 20, pages 144 - 152 | - ELLINGSRUD S; SINHA M.C.; CONSTABLE S.; MACGREGOR L.M.; EIDESMO T.; JOHANSEN S.E., "Remote sensing of hy drocarbon layers by Sea Bed Logging (SBL): results from a cruise offshore Angola", THE LEADING EDGE, (2002), vol. 21, pages 972 - 982 | - HOWARDS R. N.; LAW L. K.; DELAURIER J. M., "On measuring the electrical conductivity of the oceanic crust by a modified magnetometric resistivity method", J. GEOPHYS. RES., (1981), vol. 86, pages 11609 - 11615 | - JOHANSEN S.E.; AMUNDSEN H.E.F.; ROSTEN T.; ELLINSGRUD S.; EIDESMO T.; BHUYIAN A.H., "Subsurface hydrocarbon detected by electromagnetic sounding", FIRST BREAK, (2005), vol. 23, pages 31 - 36 | - KAUFMAN A. A.; KELLER G. V., Frequency and transient soundings. Amsterdam, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBL. CO., (1983), pages 411 - 454 | - KONG F. N.; WESTERDAHL H; ELLINGSRUD, S.; EIDESMO T.; JOHANSEN S., "Seabed logging", OIL AND GAS JOURNAL, (20020513), pages 30 - 38 | - MACGREGOR L.; SINHA M., "Use of marine controlled-source electromagnetic sounding for sub-basalt exploration", GEOPHYSICAL PROSPECTING, (2000), vol. 48, pages 1091 - 1106 | - MACGREGOR L.; SINHA M.; CONSTABLE S., "Electrical resistivity of the Valu Fa Ridge, Lau Basin, from marine controlled-source electromagnetic sounding", GEOPH. J. INTERN., (2001), vol. 146, pages 217 - 236 | - Marine MT in China with Phoenix equipment, PHOENIX GEOPHYSICS LTD., (200412), pages 1 - 2 | - SINGER B.SH.; FAINBERG E.B., "Electromagnetic induction in non-uniform thin layers", IZMIRAN, (1985), page 234 | - SINGER B. SH., "Method for solution of Maxwell's equations in non-uniform media", GEOPHYSICAL JOURN. INTERN., (1995), vol. 120, pages 590 - 598 | - "Polymetallic sulfide exploration on the deep sea floor: The feasibility of the MINI-MOSES experiment", GEOPHYSICS, (1986), vol. 51, no. 9, pages 1808 - 1818 | - YUAN J.; EDWARD R.N., "Towed seafloor electromagnetics and assessment of gas hydrate deposits", GEOPHYS. RES. LETT. V., (2001), vol. 27, no. 6, pages 2397 - 2400 | - YUAN J.; EDWARD R.N., "The assessment of marine gas hydrates through electrical remote sounding: Hydrate without BSR?", GEOPHYS. RES. LETT., (2004), vol. 27, no. 16, pages 2397 - 2400 | - ZIOLKOVSKY A.; HOBBS B.; WRIGHT D., "First direct hydrocarbon detection and reservoir monitoring using transient electromagnetics", FIRST BREAK, (2002), vol. 20, no. 4, pages 224 - 225 |