EP1941483 - MONO AND MULTI-LAYER LABELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.07.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2011 | Change - representative | published on 11.01.2012 [2012/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced Plastics Technologies Luxembourg S.A. 82 Route d'Arlon 1150 Luxembourg / LU | [2008/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUTCHINSON, Gerald 31851 Via Patito Coto de Caza, California 92679 / US | 02 /
FARHA, Said 12 Crestview Drive Pleasantville, New York 10570 / US | [2008/39] |
Former [2008/28] | 01 /
HUTCHINSON, Gerald 3 Addington Place Coto de Caza, California 92688 / US | ||
02 /
FARHA, Said 12 Crestview Drive Pleasantville, New York 10570 / US | Representative(s) | polypatent Postfach 40 02 43 51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/02] | Polypatent Postfach 40 02 43 51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [2010/02] | Polypatent Postfach 11 07 51482 Overath / DE | ||
Former [2008/28] | Polypatent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 06813575.5 | 18.08.2006 | [2008/28] | WO2006US32488 | Priority number, date | US20050709984P | 19.08.2005 Original published format: US 709984 P | US20050732860P | 02.11.2005 Original published format: US 732860 P | [2008/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007022463 | Date: | 22.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1941483 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G09F3/02, G09F3/10, C08J5/18, C08J9/32, B32B27/32, B32B5/20, B65D23/08, D21H21/54 | [2008/28] | CPC: |
B32B5/20 (EP,KR,US);
G09F3/02 (EP,KR,US);
B32B5/18 (US);
B32B27/18 (EP,US);
B32B27/32 (EP,KR,US);
B32B29/007 (US);
B65D23/08 (KR);
C08J5/18 (EP,US);
G09F3/10 (EP,US);
B32B2307/7265 (US);
B32B2307/736 (US);
B32B2317/12 (US);
B32B2323/10 (US);
B32B2519/00 (US);
C08J2323/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MONO- UND MEHRSCHICHT-LABEL | [2008/28] | English: | MONO AND MULTI-LAYER LABELS | [2008/28] | French: | ETIQUETTES MONOCOUCHES ET MULTICOUCHES | [2008/28] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/28] | 01.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/34] | 06.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2004302125 (FUJI SEAL INC) [X] 1,2,10-12,20,21,23,29,30,39,40,42 * abstract *; | [X]JP2004252291 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4-6,10-12,20,21,23,24,27-30,32,33,44,62 * abstract *; | [X]JP2003175964 (FUJI SEAL INC) [X] 1,2,10-12,20-22,29,30,39,40 * abstract *; | [XA]JPH03111885 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1,2,10-13,20,21,23,24,27,28 * abstract * [A] 4-7; | [X]JP2003022017 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1,2,10-12,20,21,24,27 * abstract *; | [XI]JPH0627882 (OSAKA SEALING LABEL PRINT) [X] 1,2,7,10-13,20,21,23,24,27 * abstract * [I] 56; | [X]US3401475 (MOREHOUSE DONALD S, et al) [X] 1,2,7,8,10-13,20,21,23,24,28-30,36,40,42,44,46 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 68; figures 1,2; claim - *; | [XA]JPH10337796 (FUJI SEAL IND CO LTD) [X] 1-3,10,11,20,22,25,28 * abstract * [A] 13,17,18; | [X]JP2001030398 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1,2,7,10,11,13,20,21,23,24,27 * abstract *; | [X]JPH11227082 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1,2,10-12,20-22,24 * abstract *; | [PX]EP1577861 (PEPSICO INC [US]) [PX] 1-3,10-13,20,21,23-31,41,43 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0020] *; | [I]DE4306103 (MILDENBERGER & WILLING VERPACK [DE]) [I] 1-3,8-21,23,25,27-31,34-37,39-41,43 * column 3, line 28 - column 4, line 15; figure .; claim - *; | [I]US3995087 (DESANZO DIRK J) [I] 1-3,7,10-12,22,26,28 * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 22; figure .; claims 1,3 *; | [I]US6379497 (SANDSTROM ERLAND [US], et al) [I] 1,2,4-6,62 * column 18, line 13 - column 19, line 16 * * column 21, line 33 - column 22, line 40 * * claims 1,6-8,49,54 *; | [XI]JPH0584860 (KANZAKI PAPER MFG CO LTD) [X] 29,30,40,42 * abstract * [I] 56,60,62; | [A]EP0667234 (OWENS ILLINOIS LABELS INC [US]) [A] 1,10-13,19-21,29,39-41,44-46 * page 2, line 43 - page 4, line 47; figures 2,3; claim - *; | [A]US2002132100 (ELFVING KLAS [SE], et al) [A] 1-3,17-24,26,29-31,44 * claims 1,15-19 * |