EP1871239 - SUTURE FIXATION DEVICE FOR SURGICAL REPAIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/01] | SUTURE FIXATION DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SURGICAL REPAIR | ||
[2014/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arthroscopic Innovations LLC 65 Winter St. Weymouth, MA 02188 / US | [2008/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CERUNDOLO, Daniel Arthroscopic Innovations LLC 65 Winter St. Weymouth, MA 02188 / US | [2014/33] |
Former [2008/01] | 01 /
CERUNDOLO, Daniel Arthroscopic Innovations LLC 65 Winter St. Weymouth, MA 02188 / US | Representative(s) | Grey, Ian Michael, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2014/33] |
Former [2008/01] | Grey, Ian Michael, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06824698.2 | 12.04.2006 | [2008/01] | WO2006US13929 | Priority number, date | US20050110419 | 20.04.2005 Original published format: US 110419 | [2008/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007024282 | Date: | 01.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1871239 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1871239 | Date: | 13.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/04 | [2008/01] | CPC: |
A61B17/0401 (EP,US);
A61B17/0487 (EP,US);
A61B17/1778 (EP,US);
A61B17/1714 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0409 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0414 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/31] |
Former [2008/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | NAHTFIXIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR CHIRURGISCHE REPARATUREN | [2014/01] | English: | SUTURE FIXATION DEVICE FOR SURGICAL REPAIR | [2014/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION DE SUTURE POUR UNE REPARATION CHIRURGICALE | [2014/01] |
Former [2008/01] | NAHTFIXIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR CHIRURGISCHE REPARATUREN | ||
Former [2008/01] | SUTURE FIXATION DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SURGICAL REPAIR | ||
Former [2008/01] | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE FIXATION DE SUTURE POUR UNE REPARATION CHIRURGICALE | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 24.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   30.06.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0755656 (ETHICON INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5-9,13 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1013229 (DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS INC [US]) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0021]; figure - *; | [A]US2004204724 (KISSEL CHRISTIAN [DE], et al) [A] 1-14* figure - * | by applicant | EP1013229 |