EP1949736 - A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ZONECODE-BASED REGISTRATION IN ACTIVE STATE IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.01.2013 [2013/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2008/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRAKASH, Rajat 8730 Costa Verde Blvd., Apt. 2439 San Diego, California 92122 / US | 02 /
ULUPINAR, Fatih 17387 Grandee Place San Diego, California 92128 / US | 03 /
TEAGUE, Edward, Harrison 4614 Bryson Terrace San Diego, California 92130 / US | 04 /
SUTIVONG, Arak 12 Soi Prasatsuk, Yen-A-Kat Road 10120 Bangkok / TH | 05 /
KHANDEKAR, Aamod 8465 Regents Road, 339 San Diego, California 92122 / US | 06 /
GOROKHOV, Alexei 12543 El Camino Real San Diego, California 92130 / US | [2008/31] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Witte, Weller & Partner Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte Rotebühlstrasse 121 D-70178 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 06827072.7 | 27.10.2006 | [2008/31] | WO2006US42313 | Priority number, date | US20050731126P | 27.10.2005 Original published format: US 731126 P | [2008/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007051015 | Date: | 03.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1949736 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38 | [2008/31] | CPC: |
H04W52/0235 (EP,KR,US);
H04B17/382 (EP,KR,US);
H04B17/318 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0026 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0028 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0675 (EP,KR,US);
H04L27/2647 (EP,KR,US);
H04L41/0803 (EP,KR,US);
H04L41/0869 (EP,US);
H04L65/00 (KR);
H04W24/10 (EP,KR,US);
H04W88/02 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0003 (EP,US);
H04L41/083 (EP,US);
Y02D30/00 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR REGISTRATION AUF ZONENCODEBASIS IM AKTIVEN ZUSTAND IN DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEMEN | [2008/31] | English: | A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ZONECODE-BASED REGISTRATION IN ACTIVE STATE IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2008/31] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR ENREGISTREMENT BASE SUR CODE DE ZONE DANS UN ETAT ACTIF DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2008/31] | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/31] | 19.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/03] | 03.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.12.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - 3GPP2 C, "cdma2000 High Rate Packet Data Air Interface Specification; 3GPP2 C.S0024-A version 2.0,", 3GPP2 CDMA2000, (200507), pages 0, 8-106,8-155 - 8-157,8-168, XP002425687 [X] 1-9 * pages 8-106, line 29 - line 31 * * pages 8-155, line 30 - line 33 * * pages 8-156, line 25 - pages 8-157, line 7 * * pages 8-168, paragraphs FOOTNOTE,70 * | [PX] - TOMCIK J ET AL, "QFDD and QTDD: Proposed Draft Air Interface Specification, chapter 6, Lower MAC Control Sublayer", IEEE C802.20-05/69, XX, XX, (20051028), pages I - XXXI,1, XP002423447 [PX] 1-9 * pages 6-59, paragraph 6.5.5.4.2.6 * |