|
18.08.2022 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2022 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
20 |
|
08.08.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.08.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.06.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.06.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2022 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.06.2022 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.06.2022 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2022 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.06.2022 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.06.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2022 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2022 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.06.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2022 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.05.2022 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.05.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.05.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.05.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.05.2022 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2022 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2022 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2022 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.04.2022 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2022 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.04.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2022 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.02.2022 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
10 |
|
09.02.2022 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
10 |
|
17.12.2021 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.12.2021 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.12.2021 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.12.2021 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.2021 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.2021 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.08.2021 |
Document concerning representation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.10.2020 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.2020 |
Request concerning representative opponent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.04.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2018 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
20 |
|
27.02.2018 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.2017 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
30.05.2017 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
50 |
|
29.03.2017 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.03.2017 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.03.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.03.2017 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.01.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.01.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2017 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
12.01.2017 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2017 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.01.2017 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
39 |
|
12.01.2017 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2017 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2017 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2017 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.01.2017 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
62 |
|
29.11.2016 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
31.10.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.10.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.10.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.10.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.10.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.10.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.10.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.10.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.10.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.10.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.10.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.10.2016 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.10.2016 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.10.2016 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.10.2016 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.10.2016 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.10.2016 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.10.2016 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.10.2016 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.10.2016 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.10.2016 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.10.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.10.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
26.10.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.10.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.10.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
26.10.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.10.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.10.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
303 |
|
26.10.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.09.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.09.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.08.2016 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.08.2016 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.2016 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.08.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2016 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2015 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.11.2015 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.11.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2015 |
Communication of amended entries |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.03.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2015 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2015 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
18.02.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2015 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2015 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
60 |
|
05.12.2014 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.11.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2014 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2014 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.11.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.11.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.11.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.11.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.11.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.11.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.11.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.11.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.11.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.11.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.11.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.11.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.11.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
35 |
|
03.11.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.11.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
03.11.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.11.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.11.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.10.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
31.10.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
31.10.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
31.10.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
31.10.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
31.10.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
31.10.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
31.10.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
31.10.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
31.10.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
31.10.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
31.10.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
31.10.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
35 |
|
31.10.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.10.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
31.10.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.10.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
31.10.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.08.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.08.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.05.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.05.2014 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.05.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.04.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.04.2014 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.04.2014 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.04.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
33 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.06.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2012 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.03.2012 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
268 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
45 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
70 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
45 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
34 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
37 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
68 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
81 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
35 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
34 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
39 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
02.11.2011 |
Communication concerning corrections of the European patent specification |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2011 |
Letter concerning publication issues |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.10.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.10.2011 |
Request for correction of the publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.05.2011 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.04.2011 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2011 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2011 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2011 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.08.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.08.2009 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.08.2009 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.05.2009 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.05.2009 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.05.2009 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
02.04.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.04.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.03.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2008 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2008 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.07.2008 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
07.07.2008 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
28.04.2008 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2008 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2008 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.04.2008 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.2008 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.03.2008 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
20.03.2008 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.03.2008 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.03.2008 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
20.03.2008 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
20.03.2008 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
20.03.2008 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
20.03.2008 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.03.2008 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.02.2008 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
20.02.2008 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/429 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
07.02.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.02.2008 |
Despatch of copy of consultation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.02.2008 |
Result of consultation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.01.2008 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
14.01.2008 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
14.01.2008 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
13.12.2007 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.12.2007 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
13.12.2007 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
12.09.2007 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2007 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
16.08.2007 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.08.2007 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
01.08.2007 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
01.08.2007 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
30.07.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
30.07.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
12.07.2007 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.07.2007 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
25.04.2007 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
02.03.2007 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
02.03.2007 |
Notification relating to declaration under Rule 4.17 PCT (copy for ISA/EP) |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
20.12.2006 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
20.12.2006 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |
|
20.12.2006 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
28 |
|
20.12.2006 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |