EP1948530 - BEVERAGE INGREDIENT CONTAINING CAPSULE HAVING SEVERAL COMPARTMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 13.12.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Entre-deux-Villes 1800 Vevey / CH | [2019/28] |
Former [2017/42] | For all designated states Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | ||
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANDRALIS, Zenon, Ioannis Ch. de la Rochette 10 CH-1071 Chexbres / CH | 02 /
DENISART, Jean-Paul Ch. de la Jaque 15 CH-1093 La Conversion / CH | 03 /
WARD, Tony 18 Forest Grove York Yorkshire YO31 1BL / GB | 04 /
GAILLARD, Julien No 522 Jiu Shi West suburb Garden Quing Pu Xu Jing No 168 Lao Quing ping Rd Post code Shanghai 201702 / CN | [2012/22] |
Former [2008/31] | 01 /
MANDRALIS, Zenon, Ioannis Ch. de la Rochette 10 CH-1071 Chexbres / CH | ||
02 /
DENISART, Jean-Paul Ch. de la Jaque 15 CH-1093 La Conversion / CH | |||
03 /
WARD, Tony 18 Forest Grove York Yorkshire YO31 1BL / GB | |||
04 /
GAILLARD, Julien No 522 Jiu Shi West suburb Garden Quing Pu Xu Jing No 168 Lao Quing ping Rd Post code Shanghai 201702 / CN | Representative(s) | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/26] | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/28] | Borne, Patrice Daniel Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | ||
Former [2009/29] | Borne, Patrice Daniel Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | ||
Former [2008/31] | Borne, Patrice Daniel Nestec S.A. IP Department Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | Application number, filing date | 06829938.7 | 06.11.2006 | [2008/31] | WO2006EP68121 | Priority number, date | EP20050024566 | 10.11.2005 Original published format: EP 05024566 | [2008/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007054479 | Date: | 18.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1948530 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1948530 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B65D85/804, A23F5/24 | [2012/18] | CPC data not yet available |
Former IPC [2008/31] | B65D81/00, A47J31/40, A23F5/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/31] | Extension states | AL | 10.06.2008 | BA | 10.06.2008 | HR | 10.06.2008 | MK | 10.06.2008 | RS | 10.06.2008 | Title | German: | GETRÄNKEZUSATZ MIT EINER KAPSEL MIT MEHREREN FÄCHERN | [2008/31] | English: | BEVERAGE INGREDIENT CONTAINING CAPSULE HAVING SEVERAL COMPARTMENTS | [2008/31] | French: | INGREDIENT DE BOISSON CONTENANT UNE CAPSULE POSSEDANT PLUSIEURS COMPARTIMENTS | [2008/31] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/31] | 01.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.09.2008 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.04.2013
ADMISSIBLE Mondelez Global LLC Three Parkway North Deerfield, IL 60015 / US Opponent's representative Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | 02
11.04.2013
ADMISSIBLE Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte 26 00187 Roma / IT Opponent's representative Santi, Filippo Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte 26 00187 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2013/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.04.2013
ADMISSIBLE Mondelez Global LLC Three Parkway North Deerfield, IL 60015 / US Opponent's representative Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
02
11.04.2013
ADMISSIBLE Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte 26 00187 Roma / IT Opponent's representative Santi, Filippo Barzano' & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte 26 00187 Roma / IT | 06.06.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.11.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.03.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.04.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 08.04.2015 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 02.12.2019 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2020/03] | Appeal following opposition | 22.05.2015 | Appeal received No. T1177/15 | 18.08.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 02.12.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.07.2012 | EE | 11.07.2012 | LT | 11.07.2012 | LV | 11.07.2012 | LU | 06.11.2012 | IS | 11.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | AT | 06.11.2017 | CZ | 06.11.2017 | FI | 06.11.2017 | IE | 06.11.2017 | PL | 06.11.2017 | RO | 06.11.2017 | SK | 06.11.2017 | TR | 06.11.2017 | HU | 07.11.2017 | SE | 07.11.2017 | SI | 07.11.2017 | BE | 30.11.2017 | DK | 30.11.2017 | NL | 01.12.2017 | PT | 07.05.2018 | GR | 04.06.2018 | BG | 05.06.2018 | [2022/30] |
Former [2019/22] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
LU | 06.11.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
AT | 06.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2017 | ||
FI | 06.11.2017 | ||
IE | 06.11.2017 | ||
PL | 06.11.2017 | ||
RO | 06.11.2017 | ||
SK | 06.11.2017 | ||
HU | 07.11.2017 | ||
SE | 07.11.2017 | ||
SI | 07.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
DK | 30.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.12.2017 | ||
PT | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 04.06.2018 | ||
BG | 05.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
LU | 06.11.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
AT | 06.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2017 | ||
FI | 06.11.2017 | ||
IE | 06.11.2017 | ||
RO | 06.11.2017 | ||
SK | 06.11.2017 | ||
HU | 07.11.2017 | ||
SE | 07.11.2017 | ||
SI | 07.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
DK | 30.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.12.2017 | ||
PT | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 04.06.2018 | ||
BG | 05.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
LU | 06.11.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
AT | 06.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2017 | ||
FI | 06.11.2017 | ||
IE | 06.11.2017 | ||
RO | 06.11.2017 | ||
SK | 06.11.2017 | ||
HU | 07.11.2017 | ||
SE | 07.11.2017 | ||
SI | 07.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
DK | 30.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.12.2017 | ||
PT | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 04.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
LU | 06.11.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
AT | 06.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2017 | ||
FI | 06.11.2017 | ||
IE | 06.11.2017 | ||
RO | 06.11.2017 | ||
SK | 06.11.2017 | ||
HU | 07.11.2017 | ||
SE | 07.11.2017 | ||
SI | 07.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.12.2017 | ||
PT | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 04.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
LU | 06.11.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
AT | 06.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2017 | ||
FI | 06.11.2017 | ||
IE | 06.11.2017 | ||
RO | 06.11.2017 | ||
SK | 06.11.2017 | ||
HU | 07.11.2017 | ||
SE | 07.11.2017 | ||
SI | 07.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.12.2017 | ||
PT | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 04.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
LU | 06.11.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
AT | 06.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2017 | ||
FI | 06.11.2017 | ||
RO | 06.11.2017 | ||
SK | 06.11.2017 | ||
HU | 07.11.2017 | ||
SE | 07.11.2017 | ||
SI | 07.11.2017 | ||
PT | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 04.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
LU | 06.11.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
AT | 06.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2017 | ||
FI | 06.11.2017 | ||
SK | 06.11.2017 | ||
SI | 07.11.2017 | ||
PT | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 04.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
LU | 06.11.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2017 | ||
FI | 06.11.2017 | ||
SK | 06.11.2017 | ||
SI | 07.11.2017 | ||
PT | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 04.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
LU | 06.11.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2017 | ||
FI | 06.11.2017 | ||
SK | 06.11.2017 | ||
PT | 07.05.2018 | ||
Former [2014/27] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
LU | 06.11.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 11.07.2012 | Cited in | International search | [XA]FR1503185 (UNILEVER NV) [X] 1,2,4,6,16-18,20,22-26,28 * figure - * [A] 3; | [X]EP0245575 (GREITHER PETER) [X] 1,2,4,6,16-18,20,22-26,28 * figure 1; claims 1-8 *; | [A]WO9733482 (NESTLE SA [CH]) [A] 1-9,16,20,22-26,28* claims 1,3 *; | [X]WO9940829 (HAYDON JAMES ANDREW [IE]) [X] 1,6,17,18,22-28 * figure 8 *; | [A]DE19838637 (DABELOW JUERGEN [DE]) [A] 1,6,17,18,20,22,28 * column 3, line 49 - line 54; figure 2 *; | [A]GB2372735 (DEMETRIOU GEORGE [GB], et al) [A] 1-3,5,6,17,18,20,22,25,28 * abstract * * page 4, line 1 - line 3; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2004026091 (NESTEC SA [CH], et al) [A] 1,17,18,20,22,28,30 * abstract * * page 9, paragraph 1; figure 1; claims 14,23 *; | [A]WO2004071899 (IMA SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-3,5,6,17,18,20,22,25,28,30 * figures 3,5 * |