EP1941165 - COOLING SYSTEM FOR A WORK MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CATERPILLAR INC. 100 N.E. Adams Street Peoria IL 61629-6490 / US | [2008/37] |
Former [2008/28] | For all designated states Caterpillar, Inc. 100 N.E. Adams Street Peoria, IL 61629-6490 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TUNTLAND, John, E. House 50 1, Zhanghua Aue 1 Shiman District 266071 Qingdao, Shandong XX 266071 / CN | 02 /
DUPREE, Ronald, L. 1276 School Street Washington, IL 61571 / US | 03 /
JOHNSON, Sean, W. ROOM 101, BUILDING 9, NO. 9 DONGHAI ZHONG LU Shinan District Qingdao XX 266071 / CN | 04 /
TIWARI, Deepak 1725 Orrington Ave., Apt. 226-1 Evanston, IL 60201 / US | 05 /
WEISMAN, Roland, E. 22900 W. TWILIGHT TRAIL Buckeye, AZ 85326 / US | 06 /
WU, Jennifer, Yanfang 2311 Kentuck Court Naperville, IL 60564 / US | 07 /
ZUECK, Eugene, E. 237 Parkridge Drive Clayton, NC 27527 / US | [2013/21] |
Former [2008/28] | 01 /
TUNTLAND, John, E. House 50 1, Zhanghua Aue 1 Shiman District 266071 Qingdao, Shandong XX 266071 / CN | ||
02 /
DUPREE, Ronald, L. 1276 School Street Washington, IL 61571 / US | |||
03 /
JOHNSON, Sean, W. ROOM 101, BUILDING 9, NO. 9 DONGHAI ZHONG LU Shinan District Qingdao XX 266071 / CN | |||
04 /
TIWARI, Deepak 1725 Orrington Ave., Apt. 226-1 Evanston, IL 60201 / US | |||
05 /
WEISMAN, Roland, E. 22900 W. TWILIGHT TRAIL Buckeye, AZ 85326 / US | |||
06 /
WU, Jennifer, Yanfang 2311 Kentuck Court Naperville, IL 60564 / US | |||
07 /
ZUECK, Eugene, E. 237 Parkridge Drive Clayton, NC 27527 / US | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/21] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/28] | Wagner, Karl H. WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06836477.7 | 24.10.2006 | [2008/28] | WO2006US41375 | Priority number, date | US20050729740P | 24.10.2005 Original published format: US 729740 P | US20060584911 | 23.10.2006 Original published format: US 584911 | [2008/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007050550 | Date: | 03.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1941165 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1941165 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F15B21/04 | [2008/28] | CPC: |
F28F9/0234 (EP,US);
F28F9/22 (EP,US);
F28F2009/224 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÜHLANLAGE FÜR EINE ARBEITSMASCHINE | [2008/28] | English: | COOLING SYSTEM FOR A WORK MACHINE | [2008/28] | French: | SYSTEME DE REFROIDISSEMENT POUR ENGIN DE CHANTIER | [2008/28] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/28] | 12.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/18] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 19.08.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 19.08.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.10.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.10.2006 | AT | 22.05.2013 | CY | 22.05.2013 | CZ | 22.05.2013 | DK | 22.05.2013 | EE | 22.05.2013 | IT | 22.05.2013 | LT | 22.05.2013 | LV | 22.05.2013 | MC | 22.05.2013 | NL | 22.05.2013 | RO | 22.05.2013 | SI | 22.05.2013 | SK | 22.05.2013 | TR | 22.05.2013 | BG | 22.08.2013 | GR | 23.08.2013 | ES | 02.09.2013 | IS | 22.09.2013 | PT | 23.09.2013 | GB | 24.10.2013 | IE | 24.10.2013 | LU | 24.10.2013 | CH | 31.10.2013 | FR | 31.10.2013 | LI | 31.10.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
CY | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
TR | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
GB | 24.10.2013 | ||
IE | 24.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
FR | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
CY | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
GB | 24.10.2013 | ||
IE | 24.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
FR | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
GB | 24.10.2013 | ||
IE | 24.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
FR | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
GB | 24.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
FR | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
GB | 24.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 22.05.2013 | |
PT | 23.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US4898078 (GAGE DOUGLAS M [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9-18,21-24 * column 5, line 18 - line 57; figure 2a * [I] 25-34,37-39; | [XI]US6029445 (LECH RICHARD J [US]) [X] 1-6,9-18,21-24 * column 5, line 21 - column 6, line 35; figure 1 * [I] 25-34,37-39; | [XI]US3498061 (PRUCHA HAROLD E, et al) [X] 1-6,9-18,21-24 * column 2, line 26 - column 3, line 28; figures 1,2A * [I] 24-34,37-39; | [I]US3962870 (LECH RICHARD J) [I] 1-6,9-18,21-34,37-39 * column 3, line 32 - column 4, line 47; figure 2 *; | [DA]US4535729 (FAYLOR LAWRENCE E [US]) [DA] 1,13,25 * figure 1 *; | [A]US6354089 (LECH RICHARD J [US], et al) [A] 1,13,25 * figure 2; claim 1 *; | [A]US2004060290 (STAHLMAN DAVID B [US]) [A] 1,13,25 * figure 1 * |