Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1951304

EP1951304 - METHOD FOR TREATING JOINT DAMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.11.2018
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
14.09.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4002 Basel / CH
For all designated states
Biogen Idec Inc.
14 Cambridge Center
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
For all designated states
Genentech, Inc.
1 DNA Way
South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4002 Basel / CH
For all designated states
Biogen Idec Inc.
14 Cambridge Center
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
For all designated states
Genentech, Inc.
1 DNA Way
South San Francisco CA 94080-4990 / US
Former [2008/32]For all designated states
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4002 Basel / CH
For all designated states
Biogen Idec Inc.
14 Cambridge Center
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
For all designated states
Genentech, Inc.
1 DNA Way
South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US
Inventor(s)01 / TOTORITIS, Mark
15797 Caminito Cantaras
Del Mar, CA 92014 / US
02 / SHAW, Timothy Mark
3 Brackenhill
Berkhamsted
Hertfordshire / GB
03 / AGARWAL, Sunil
4 Wildflower Court
Corte Madera, CA 94925 / US
04 / YOCUM, David
1149 Shoreline Drive
San Mateo, CA 94404 / US
05 / KELMAN, Ariella
1732 Jackson Street, 204
South San Francisco, CA 94109 / US
 [2014/43]
Former [2008/32]01 / TOTORITIS, Mark
15797 Caminito Cantaras
Del Mar, CA 92014 / US
02 / SHAW, Timothy Mark
3 Brackenhill Berkhamsted
Hertfordshire / GB
03 / AGARWAL, Sunil
4 Wildflower Court
Corte Madera, CA 94925 / US
04 / YOCUM, David
1149 Shoreline Drive
San Mateo, CA 94404 / US
05 / KELMAN, Ariella
1732 Jackson Street, 204
South San Francisco, CA 94109 / US
Representative(s)Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/43]Walton, Seán Malcolm , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
33 Gutter Lane
London
EC2V 8AS / GB
Former [2008/32]Walton, Seán Malcolm , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date06837634.214.11.2006
[2008/32]
WO2006US44290
Priority number, dateUS20050737291P15.11.2005         Original published format: US 737291 P
US20060864463P06.11.2006         Original published format: US 864463 P
[2008/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007059188
Date:24.05.2007
Language:EN
[2007/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1951304
Date:06.08.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2007
[2008/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1951304
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.05.2007
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/395, A61P19/02, A61K31/00, C07K16/28
[2008/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/32]
Extension statesAL03.06.2008
BA03.06.2008
HR03.06.2008
MK03.06.2008
RS03.06.2008
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON GELENKSCHÄDEN[2008/32]
English:METHOD FOR TREATING JOINT DAMAGE[2008/32]
French:PROCEDE DESTINE A TRAITER UNE LESION ARTICULAIRE[2008/32]
Entry into regional phase03.06.2008National basic fee paid 
03.06.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
03.06.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.06.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.06.2008Examination requested  [2008/32]
13.01.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.11.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.02.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.07.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.10.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.07.2012Observations by third parties
20.08.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
29.10.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.12.2012Observations by third parties
31.05.2013Observations by third parties
15.07.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.02.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
01.05.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.07.2014Observations by third parties
29.07.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.07.2014Fee for grant paid
31.07.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
31.07.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP13178006.6   Application deemed to be withdrawn  : 27.08.2013
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.01.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  21.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Richter Gedeon Nyrt.
Gyömröi út 19-21
1103 Budapest / HU
Opponent's representative
Neuefeind, Regina
Maiwald Patentanwalts- und
Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
 02  21.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG/ Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH
Binger Straße 173
55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 03  21.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Merck Serono S.A.
Zone Industrielle de l'Ouriettaz
1170 Aubonne / CH
Opponent's representative
Merck Serono S.A. Intellectual Property
Terre Bonne Business Park
Building Z0
Route de Crassier 1
1262 Eysins / CH
 04  22.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
European Oppositions Limited
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Opponent's representative
Care, Alison, et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
 05  22.07.2015  19.03.2019  WITHDRAWN
Taylor Wessing LLP
5 New Street Square
London EC4A 3TW / GB
Opponent's representative
Royle, Matthew Charles James
Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square
London EC4A 3TW / GB
 06  22.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Hexal AG
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Breuer, Markus
Brienner Straße 1
80333 München / DE
 07  22.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Celltrion, Inc.
23 Academy-ro
Yeonsu-gu
Incheon 406-840 / KR
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 08  07.04.2017  12.04.2017  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Mundipharma GmbH
Mundipharma Strasse 2
65549 Limburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Care, Alison, et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
 09  10.04.2017  18.04.2017  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Mundipharma Pharmaceutical s.r.l
Via Serbelloni, n. 4
Milan / IT
Opponent's representative
Briscoe, Paul Brian, et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
 [2019/41]
Former [2019/17]
Opponent(s)01  21.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Richter Gedeon Nyrt.
Gyömröi út 19-21
1103 Budapest / HU
Opponent's representative
Neuefeind, Regina
Maiwald Patentanwalts- und
Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
 02  21.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG/ Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH
Binger Straße 173
55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 03  21.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Merck Serono S.A.
Zone Industrielle de l'Ouriettaz
1170 Aubonne / CH
Opponent's representative
Merck Serono S.A. Intellectual Property
Terre Bonne Business Park A2
Route de Crassier 15
1162 Eysins / CH
 04  22.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
European Oppositions Limited
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Opponent's representative
Care, Alison, et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
 05  22.07.2015  19.03.2019  WITHDRAWN
Taylor Wessing LLP
5 New Street Square
London EC4A 3TW / GB
Opponent's representative
Royle, Matthew Charles James
Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square
London EC4A 3TW / GB
 06  22.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Hexal AG
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Brienner Strasse 1
80333 München / DE
 07  22.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Celltrion, Inc.
23 Academy-ro
Yeonsu-gu
Incheon 406-840 / KR
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 08  07.04.2017  12.04.2017  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Mundipharma GmbH
Mundipharma Strasse 2
65549 Limburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Care, Alison, et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
 09  10.04.2017  18.04.2017  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Mundipharma Pharmaceutical s.r.l
Via Serbelloni, n. 4
Milan / IT
Opponent's representative
Briscoe, Paul Brian, et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
Former [2018/25]
Opponent(s)01  21.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Richter Gedeon Nyrt.
Gyömröi út 19-21
1103 Budapest / HU
Opponent's representative
Neuefeind, Regina
Maiwald Patentanwalts- und
Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
 02  21.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG/ Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH
Binger Straße 173
55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 03  21.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Merck Serono S.A.
Zone Industrielle de l'Ouriettaz
1170 Aubonne / CH
Opponent's representative
Merck Serono S.A. Intellectual Property
Terre Bonne Business Park A2
Route de Crassier 15
1162 Eysins / CH
 04  22.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
European Oppositions Limited
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Opponent's representative
Care, Alison, et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
 05  22.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Taylor Wessing LLP
5 New Street Square
London EC4A 3TW / GB
Opponent's representative
Royle, Matthew Charles James
Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square
London EC4A 3TW / GB
 06  22.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Hexal AG
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Brienner Strasse 1
80333 München / DE
 07  22.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Celltrion, Inc.
23 Academy-ro
Yeonsu-gu
Incheon 406-840 / KR
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 08  07.04.2017  12.04.2017  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Mundipharma GmbH
Mundipharma Strasse 2
65549 Limburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Care, Alison, et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
 09  10.04.2017  18.04.2017  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Mundipharma Pharmaceutical s.r.l
Via Serbelloni, n. 4
Milan / IT
Opponent's representative
Briscoe, Paul Brian, et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
Former [2017/48]
Opponent(s)01  21.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Richter Gedeon Nyrt.
Gyömröi út 19-21
1103 Budapest / HU
Opponent's representative
Neuefeind, Regina
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
 02  21.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG/ Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH
Binger Straße 173
55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 03  21.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Merck Serono S.A.
Zone Industrielle de l'Ouriettaz
1170 Aubonne / CH
Opponent's representative
Merck Serono S.A. Intellectual Property
Zone Industrielle de l'Ouriettaz
1170 Aubonne / CH
 04  22.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
European Oppositions Limited
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Opponent's representative
Care, Alison, et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
 05  22.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Taylor Wessing LLP
5 New Street Square
London EC4A 3TW / GB
Opponent's representative
Royle, Matthew Charles James
Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square
London EC4A 3TW / GB
 06  22.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Hexal AG
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Brienner Strasse 1
80333 München / DE
 07  22.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Celltrion, Inc.
23 Academy-ro
Yeonsu-gu
Incheon 406-840 / KR
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 08  07.04.2017  12.04.2017  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Mundipharma GmbH
Mundipharma Strasse 2
65549 Limburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy, et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
 09  10.04.2017  18.04.2017  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Mundipharma Pharmaceutical s.r.l
Via Serbelloni, n. 4
Milan / IT
Opponent's representative
Briscoe, Paul Brian, et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
Former [2017/47]
Opponent(s)01  21.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Richter Gedeon Nyrt.
Gyömröi út 19-21
1103 Budapest / HU
Opponent's representative
Neuefeind, Regina
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
 02  21.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG/ Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH
Binger Straße 173
55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 03  21.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Merck Serono S.A.
Zone Industrielle de l'Ouriettaz
1170 Aubonne / CH
Opponent's representative
Merck Serono S.A. Intellectual Property
Zone Industrielle de l'Ouriettaz
1170 Aubonne / CH
 04  22.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
European Oppositions Limited
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Opponent's representative
Care, Alison, et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
 05  22.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Taylor Wessing LLP
5 New Street Square
London EC4A 3TW / GB
Opponent's representative
Royle, Matthew Charles James
Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square
London EC4A 3TW / GB
 06  22.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Hexal AG
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Brienner Strasse 1
80333 München / DE
 07  22.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Celltrion, Inc.
23 Academy-ro
Yeonsu-gu
Incheon 406-840 / KR
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 08  07.04.2017  12.04.2017  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Mundipharma GmbH
Mundipharma Strasse 2
65549 Limburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy, et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
 09  10.04.2017  18.04.2017  INTERVENTION
Mundipharma Pharmaceutical s.r.l
Via Serbelloni, n. 4
Milan / IT
Opponent's representative
Briscoe, Paul Brian, et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
Former [2017/30]
Opponent(s)01  21.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Richter Gedeon Nyrt.
Gyömröi út 19-21
1103 Budapest / HU
Opponent's representative
Neuefeind, Regina
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
 02  21.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG/ Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH
Binger Straße 173
55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 03  21.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Merck Serono S.A.
Zone Industrielle de l'Ouriettaz
1170 Aubonne / CH
Opponent's representative
Merck Serono S.A. Intellectual Property
Zone Industrielle de l'Ouriettaz
1170 Aubonne / CH
 04  22.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
European Oppositions Limited
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Opponent's representative
Care, Alison, et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
 05  22.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Taylor Wessing LLP
5 New Street Square
London EC4A 3TW / GB
Opponent's representative
Royle, Matthew Charles James
Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square
London EC4A 3TW / GB
 06  22.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Hexal AG
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Erika-Mann Strasse 23
80636 München / DE
 07  22.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Celltrion, Inc.
23 Academy-ro
Yeonsu-gu
Incheon 406-840 / KR
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 08  07.04.2017  12.04.2017  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Mundipharma GmbH
Mundipharma Strasse 2
65549 Limburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy, et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
 09  10.04.2017  18.04.2017  INTERVENTION
Mundipharma Pharmaceutical s.r.l
Via Serbelloni, n. 4
Milan / IT
Opponent's representative
Briscoe, Paul Brian, et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [2017/20]
Opponent(s)01  21.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Richter Gedeon Nyrt.
Gyömröi út 19-21
1103 Budapest / HU
Opponent's representative
Neuefeind, Regina
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
 02  21.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG/ Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH
Binger Straße 173
55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 03  21.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Merck Serono S.A.
Zone Industrielle de l'Ouriettaz
1170 Aubonne / CH
Opponent's representative
Merck Serono S.A. Intellectual Property
Zone Industrielle de l'Ouriettaz
1170 Aubonne / CH
 04  22.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
European Oppositions Limited
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Opponent's representative
Care, Alison, et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
 05  22.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Taylor Wessing LLP
5 New Street Square
London EC4A 3TW / GB
Opponent's representative
Royle, Matthew Charles James
Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square
London EC4A 3TW / GB
 06  22.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Hexal AG
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Erika-Mann Strasse 23
80636 München / DE
 07  22.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Celltrion, Inc.
23 Academy-ro
Yeonsu-gu
Incheon 406-840 / KR
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 08  07.04.2017  12.04.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Mundipharma GmbH
Mundipharma Strasse 2
65549 Limburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy, et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
 09  10.04.2017   
Mundipharma Pharmaceutical s.r.l
Via Serbelloni, n. 4
Milan / IT
Opponent's representative
Briscoe, Paul Brian, et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [2015/47]
Opponent(s)01  21.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Richter Gedeon Nyrt.
Gyömröi út 19-21
1103 Budapest / HU
Opponent's representative
Neuefeind, Regina
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
 02  21.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG/ Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH
Binger Straße 173
55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 03  21.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Merck Serono S.A.
Zone Industrielle de l'Ouriettaz
1170 Aubonne / CH
Opponent's representative
Merck Serono S.A. Intellectual Property
Zone Industrielle de l'Ouriettaz
1170 Aubonne / CH
 04  22.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
European Oppositions Limited
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Opponent's representative
Care, Alison, et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
 05  22.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Taylor Wessing LLP
5 New Street Square
London EC4A 3TW / GB
Opponent's representative
Royle, Matthew Charles James
Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square
London EC4A 3TW / GB
 06  22.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Hexal AG
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Erika-Mann Strasse 23
80636 München / DE
 07  22.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Celltrion, Inc.
23 Academy-ro
Yeonsu-gu
Incheon 406-840 / KR
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
Former [2015/41]
Opponent(s)01  21.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Richter Gedeon Nyrt.
Gyömröi út 19-21
1103 Budapest / HU
Opponent's representative
Neuefeind, Regina
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
 02  21.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG/ Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH
Binger Straße 173
55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 03  21.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Merck Serono S.A.
Zone Industrielle de l'Ouriettaz
1170 Aubonne / CH
Opponent's representative
Merck Serono S.A. Intellectual Property
Zone Industrielle de l'Ouriettaz
1170 Aubonne / CH
 04  22.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
European Oppositions Ltd
12 New Fetter Lane London
EC4A 1AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Care, Alison, et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
 05  22.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Taylor Wessing LLP
5 New Street Square
London EC4A 3TW / GB
Opponent's representative
Royle, Matthew Charles James
Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square
London EC4A 3TW / GB
 06  22.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Hexal AG
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Erika-Mann Strasse 23
80636 München / DE
 07  22.07.2015  21.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Celltrion, Inc.
23 Academy-ro
Yeonsu-gu
Incheon 406-840 / KR
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
Former [2015/37]
Opponent(s)01  21.07.2015   
Richter Gedeon Nyrt.
Gyömröi út 19-21
1103 Budapest / HU
Opponent's representative
Neuefeind, Regina
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
 02  21.07.2015   
BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA GMBH & CO. KG
Binger Strasse 173
55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 03  21.07.2015   
Merck Serono S.A.
Zone Industrielle de l'Ouriettaz
1170 Aubonne / CH
Opponent's representative
Merck Serono S.A. Intellectual Property
Zone Industrielle de l'Ouriettaz
1170 Aubonne / CH
 04  22.07.2015   
European Oppositions Ltd
12 New Fetter Lane London
EC4A 1AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Care, Alison, et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
 05  22.07.2015   
Taylor Wessing LLP
5 New Street Square
London EC4A 3TW / GB
Opponent's representative
Royle, Matthew Charles James
Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square
London EC4A 3TW / GB
 06  22.07.2015   
Hexal AG
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Erika-Mann Strasse 23
80636 München / DE
 07  22.07.2015   
Celltrion, Inc.
23 Academy-ro
Yeonsu-gu
Incheon 406-840 / KR
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
Former [2015/36]
Opponent(s)01  21.07.2015   
Richter Gedeon Nyrt.
Gyömröi út 19-21
1103 Budapest / HU
Opponent's representative
Neuefeind, Regina
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
 02  21.07.2015   
BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA GMBH & CO. KG
Binger Strasse 173
55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 03  21.07.2015   
Merck Serono S.A.
Zone Industrielle de l'Ouriettaz
1170 Aubonne / CH
Opponent's representative
Merck Serono S.A. Intellectual Property
Zone Industrielle de l'Ouriettaz
1170 Aubonne / CH
 04  22.07.2015   
European Oppositions Ltd
12 New Fetter Lane London
EC4A 1AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Care, Alison, et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
 05  22.07.2015   
Taylor Wessing LLP
5 New Street Square
London EC4A 3TW / GB
Opponent's representative
Royle, Matthew Charles James
Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square
London EC4A 3TW / GB
 06  22.07.2015   
Hexal AG
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Erika-Mann Strasse 23
80636 München / DE
Former [2015/35]
Opponent(s)01  21.07.2015   
Richter Gedeon Nyrt.
Gyömröi út 19-21
1103 Budapest / HU
Opponent's representative
Neuefeind, Regina
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
 02  21.07.2015   
BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA GMBH & CO. KG
Binger Strasse 173
55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 03  21.07.2015   
Merck Serono S.A.
Zone Industrielle de l'Ouriettaz
1170 Aubonne / CH
Opponent's representative
Merck Serono S.A. Intellectual Property
Zone Industrielle de l'Ouriettaz
1170 Aubonne / CH
 04  22.07.2015   
European Oppositions Ltd
12 New Fetter Lane London
EC4A 1AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Care, Alison, et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
 05  22.07.2015   
Taylor Wessing LLP
5 New Street Square
London EC4A 3TW / GB
Opponent's representative
Royle, Matthew Charles James
Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square
London EC4A 3TW / GB
01.09.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
11.05.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
22.06.2017No. 09: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
04.09.2017No. 09: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
27.06.2018Date of oral proceedings
16.11.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
16.11.2018Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition05.12.2018Appeal received No.  T2842/18
26.03.2019Statement of grounds filed
09.07.2020Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
17.02.2011Request for further processing filed
17.02.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
02.03.2011Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
01.05.2014Request for further processing filed
01.05.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
15.05.2014Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
10.11.2009Request for further processing filed
10.11.2009Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
25.11.2009Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
12.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
12.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
14.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
13.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
07.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIS22.02.2015
GB19.02.2016
[2016/23]
Former [2015/23]IS22.02.2015
Cited inInternational search[X]WO0222212  (IDEC PHARMA CORP [US]) [X] 1-61,65-98,101-112 * example 1; claim 34 *;
 [X]WO2005060999  (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1-112 * page 12, line 19 - page 14, column 1, line 14; claims 1-7 * * example 1 *;
 [X]US2004202658  (BENYUNES MARK C [US]) [X] 1-112 * example 1; claim 12 *;
 [X]WO0067796  (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1-61,65-98,101-112 * example 1 *;
 [X]WO2004056312  (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1-61,65-98,101-112 * examples 3,6,16; sequences 21, 22 *;
 [X]WO2004091657  (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1-112 * example 1; sequences 1-4 *;
 [X]  - PROTHEREO A ET AL, "REMISSION OF INFLAMMATORY ARTHROPATHY IN ASSOCIATION WITH ANTI-CD20THERAPY FOR NON-HODGKIN'S LYMPHOMA", RHEUMATOLOGY, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, LONDON, GB, (199911), vol. 38, no. 11, ISSN 1462-0324, pages 1150 - 1152, XP000942661 [X] 1-61,65-98,101-112 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/rheumatology/38.11.1150
 [X]  - EDWARDS J C W ET AL, "Sustained improvement in rheumatoid arthritis following a protocol designed to deplete B lymphocytes", RHEUMATOLOGY, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, LONDON, GB, (200102), vol. 40, no. 2, ISSN 1462-0324, pages 205 - 211, XP002348931 [X] 1-61,65-98,101-112 * page 206, column RIGHT, paragraph 2; tables 1,2 * * page 207, column LEFT, paragraphs 2-4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/rheumatology/40.2.205
 [X]  - KNEITZ C ET AL, "Improvement of refractory rheumatoid arthritis after depletion of B cells.", SCANDINAVIAN JOURNAL OF RHEUMATOLOGY 2004, (2004), vol. 33, no. 2, ISSN 0300-9742, pages 82 - 86, XP008076371 [X] 1-61,65-98,101-112 * page 82, column RIGHT, paragraph LAST - page 83, column LEFT, line 1; table 1 * * page 83, column LEFT, paragraph 2 * * page 85, column RIGHT, paragraph LAST *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/03009740310004379
 [X]  - GENENTECH, "Phase III Study Shows Rituxan Significantly Improves Symptoms in Patients with Rheumatoid Arthritis Who Inadequately Responded to Anti-TNF Therapies", GENENTECH PRESS RELEASE, Internet, (20050405), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://www.gene.com/gene/news/press-releases/display.do?method=print&id=8267, (20070312), XP002425321 [X] 1-61,65-98,101-112 * the whole document *
 [X]  - EDWARDS, "Efficacy and Safety of Rituximab, a B-Cell Targeted Chimeric Monoclonal Antibody: A Randomized, Placebo-Controlled Trial in Patients with Rheumatoid Arthritis", ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, USA, vol. 46, no. 9suppl, (20021025), absract 446, URL: http://www.hopkins-arthritis.som.jhmi.edu/edu/acr2002/ra-treatments.html#rituximab, (20070309), XP002425322 [X] 1-61,65-98,101-112 * abstract *
 [X]  - EMERY, "PRIMARY ANALYSIS OF A DOUBLE-BLIND, PLACEBO-CONTROLLED, DOSE-RANGING TRIAL OF RITUXIMAB, AN ANTI-CD20 MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY, IN PATIENTS WITH RHEUMATOID ARTHRITIS RECEIVING METHOTREXATE (DANCER TRIAL", ANNALS OF THE RHEUMATIC DISEASES, vol. 64, no. suppl3, (200506), pages 1 - 2, oral presentation, URL: http://eular.bmj.com/cgi/content/abstract/ardmtg;64/Suppl_3/182?maxtoshow=&HITS=10&hits=10&RESULTFORMAT=1&author1=emery&andorexacttitle=and&andorexacttitleabs=and&andorexactfulltext=and&searchid=1&FIRSTINDEX=20&sortspec=relevance&volume=64&resourcetype=HWCIT,HWELTR, (2009), XP002425323 [X] 1-61,65-98,101-112 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1136/ard.2004.025072
 [X]  - LEANDRO M J ET AL, "Clinical outcome in 22 patients with rheumatoid arthritis treated with B lymphocyte depletion", ANNALS OF THE RHEUMATIC DISEASES, BRITISH MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, LONDON, GB, (200210), vol. 61, no. 10, ISSN 0003-4967, pages 883 - 888, XP002348932 [X] 1-61,65-98,101-112 * page 884; tables 1,2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1136/ard.61.10.883
 [X]  - DE VITA SALVATORE ET AL, "Efficacy of selective B cell blockade in the treatment of rheumatoid arthritis: evidence for a pathogenetic role of B cells", ARTHRITIS AND RHEUMATISM, LIPPINCOTT, PHILADELPHIA, US, (200208), vol. 46, no. 8, ISSN 0004-3591, pages 2029 - 2033, XP002306249 [X] 1-112 * page 2032, column LEFT, paragraph LAST; tables 1,2 *
 [X]  - MOORE J ET AL, "A phase II study of Rituximab in rheumatoid arthritis patients with recurrent disease following haematopoietic stem cell transplantation.", BONE MARROW TRANSPLANTATION AUG 2004, (200408), vol. 34, no. 3, ISSN 0268-3369, pages 241 - 247, XP002425324 [X] 1-61,65-98,101-112 * page 242, column LEFT, paragraph 2 * * page 245, column RIGHT, paragraph 2 - page 246, column LEFT, paragraph LAST *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.bmt.1704570
 [X]  - GOTTENBERG J-E ET AL, "Tolerance and short term efficacy of rituximab in 43 patients with systemic autoimmune diseases.", ANNALS OF THE RHEUMATIC DISEASES JUN 2005, (200506), vol. 64, no. 6, ISSN 0003-4967, pages 913 - 920, XP002425325 [X] 1-61,65-98,101-112 * page 916, column LEFT, paragraph 5; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1136/ard.2004.029694
 [X]  - ANONYMOUS, "MabThera highly effective in treating rheumatoid arthritis", NEWS-MEDICAL.NET, (20050609), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://www.news-medical.net/print_article.asp?id=10840, (20070309), XP002425326 [X] 1-61,65-98,101-112 * the whole document *
 [X]  - HIGASHIDA, "Safety and Efficacy of Rituximab in the Treatment of Refractory Rheumatoid Arthritis. Session Type: Poster Session 139-I", BLOOD, USA, (20031116), vol. 102, no. 11, page 1, XP002425327 [X] 1-61,65-98,101-112 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2003-05-1447
 [X]  - ANONYMOUS, NCT00077870, "A Safety Study of Escalating Doses of PRO70769 for Subjects With Moderate to Severe Rheumatoid Arthritis Receiving Stable Doses of Concomitant Methotrexate", CLINICALTRIALS.GOV, internet, (20040212), pages 1 - 3, URL: http://clinicaltrials.gov/ct/show/NCT00077870;jsessionid=CDF4C4B9EF58B79A0FEED8ACAAB7AC4F?order=21, (20070319), XP002425328 [X] 1-61,65-98,101-112 * page 1, paragraph PURPOSE *
 [A]  - EDWARDS J C W ET AL, "B LYMPHOCYTE DEPLETION THERAPY WITH RITUXIMAB IN RHEUMATOID ARTHRITIS", RHEUMATIC DISEASES CLINICS OF NORTH AMERICA, W.B. SAUNDERS, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (2004), vol. 30, no. 2, ISSN 0889-857X, pages 393 - 403, XP008076293 [A] 1-112 * page 398, paragraph 3 * * page 396, paragraph 4 - page 397, paragraph 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.rdc.2004.01.006
 [X]  - GENENTECH, "Biogen Idec and Genentech Announce FDA Acceptance of Supplemental Biologics License Application and Priority Review Designation for Rituxan in Rheumatoid Arthritis", INTERNET ARTICLE, USA, (20051031), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://www.gene.com/gene/news/press-releases/display.do?method=detail&id=9047, (20070309), XP002425329 [X] 1-61,65-98,101-112 * page 1, paragraphs 1-7 *
 [PX]  - HIBBLE, "Rehaumatoid arthritis - MabThera provides lasting benefits", MEDICAL NEWS TODAY, (20051121), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://www.medicalnewstoday.com/medicalnews.php?newsid=33811, (20070309), XP002425335 [PX] 1-61,65-98,101-112 * the whole document *
 [A]  - EDWARDS J C W ET AL, "B-lymphocyte depletion therapy in rheumatoid arthritis and other autoimmune disorders", BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETY TRANSACTIONS, COLCHESTER, ESSEX, GB, (200208), vol. 30, no. 4, ISSN 0300-5127, pages 824 - 828, XP002306250 [A] * page 826, column RIGHT, paragraph 4 - page 827, paragraph 3; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/BST0300824
 [A]  - FIELDS, "Rituximab in the treatment of rheumatoid arthritis, systemic lupus, and other autoimmune diseases: past, present, and future Special Report", HOSPITAL OF SPECIAL SURGERY, (20021025), pages 1 - 9, URL: http://www.hss.edu/professional-conditions_13466.asp?refName=Autoimmune+Diseases, (20070309), XP002425336
 [PX]  - BATHON, "Rheumatoid arthritis treatments", THE JOHN HOPKINS ARTHRITIS CENTER, 2005 AMERICAN COLEGE OF RHEUMATOLOGY, USA, pages 1 - 12, URL: http://www.hopkins-arthritis.som.jhmi.edu/edu/acr2005/ra-treatments.html, (20070309), XP002425337 [PX] 1-112 * paragraphs [ABS.1830] , [1917] , [1922] *
Examination   - MEASE PHILIP J ET AL, "Efficacy and safety of retreatment in patients with rheumatoid arthritis with previous inadequate response to tumor necrosis factor inhibitors: results from the SUNRISE trial.", THE JOURNAL OF RHEUMATOLOGY MAY 2010 LNKD- PUBMED:20194448, (201005), vol. 37, no. 5, ISSN 0315-162X, pages 917 - 927
    - EUROPEAN MEDICINES AGENCY, "Summary of product characteristics", (20091030), pages 1 - 91, European Medicines Agency, URL: http://www.ema.europa.eu/docs/en_GB/document_library/EPAR_-_Product_Information/human/000165/WC500025821.pdf
    - FDA, "Rituxan: prescribing information", USA, (1997), pages 1 - 38
    - PAVELKA K ET AL, "Efficacy and safety following repeated courses of rituximab in patients with active rheumatoid arthritis", ANNALS OF THE RHEUMATIC DISEASES, & ANNUAL EUROPEAN CONGRESS OF RHEUMATOLOGY; VIENNA, AUSTRIA; JUNE 08 -11, 2005, (200507), vol. 64, no. Suppl. 3, ISSN 0003-4967, page 435
    - FLEISCHMANN R M ET AL, "Preliminary efficacy results of rituximab retreatment in patients with active rheumatoid arthritis.", ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, & 69TH ANNUAL SCIENTIFIC MEETING OF THE AMERICAN-COLLEGE-OF-RHEUMATOLOGY/40TH ANNUAL SCIENTIFIC MEETIN; SAN DIEGO, CA, USA; NOVEMBER 12 -17, 2005, (200509), vol. 52, no. 9, Suppl. S, ISSN 0004-3591, page S131
    - EMERY P ET AL, "Safety and tolerability of rituximab retreatment in patients with active rheumatoid arthritis", ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, & 69TH ANNUAL SCIENTIFIC MEETING OF THE AMERICAN-COLLEGE-OF-RHEUMATOLOGY/40TH ANNUAL SCIENTIFIC MEETIN; SAN DIEGO, CA, USA; NOVEMBER 12 -17, 2005, (200509), vol. 52, no. 9, Suppl. S, ISSN 0004-3591, page S341
    - PINCUS T ET AL, "Relative versus absolute goals of therapies for RA: ACR 20 or ACR 50 responses versus target values for "near remission" of DAS or single measures.", CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL RHEUMATOLOGY 2004 SEP-OCT, (200409), vol. 22, no. 5 Suppl 35, ISSN 0392-856X, pages S50 - S56
by applicantUS5736137
 WO2004056312
 US6737056
 US6528624
 US5500362
 US5821337
 WO9818921
 WO0112812
 WO0068378
 WO0040716
 WO03068822
 US3773919
    - ALAMONOSA; DROSOS, AUTOIMMUN. REV., (2005), vol. 4, pages 130 - 136
    - KEYSTONE, RHEUMATOLOGY, (2005), vol. 44, no. 2, pages II8 - IIL2
    - BUKHARI ET AL., ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (2002), vol. 46, pages 906 - 912
    - HELIOVAARA ET AL., ANN. RHEUM. DIS., (1995), vol. 54, pages 811 - 814
    - TEITELBAUM, SCIENCE, (2000), vol. 289, pages 1504 - 1508
    - GOLDRING; GRAVALLESE, ARTHRITIS RES., (2000), vol. 2, no. 1, pages 33 - 37
    - HOSSBAUER ET AL., J. BONE MINER. RES., (2000), vol. 15, no. 1, pages 2 - 12
    - FELDMANN ET AL., CELL, (1996), vol. 85, no. 3, pages 307 - 310
    - RAVETCH; KINET, ANNU. REV. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 9, pages 457 - 492
    - CLYNES ET AL., PNAS (USA), (1998), vol. 95, pages 652 - 656
    - J. BIOL. CHEM., (2004), vol. 279, no. 16, pages 16727 - 16735
    - STUVE ET AL., NEUROLOGY, (2002), vol. 8, pages 290 - 301
otherWO2004091567
    - FLEISCHMANN ET AL, "Preliminary Efficacy results of Rituximab Retreatment in Patients with Active Rheumatoid Arthritis.", ARTHRITIS AND RHEUMATISM, (2005), vol. 52, no. SUPPL. 9 ABSTRACT #264, page S131, XP003032169
    - PAVELKA K. ET AL, "Efficacy and safety following repeated courses of rituximab in patients with active rheumatoid arthritis.", ANN RHEUM. DIS., (2005), vol. 64, no. SUP1, page 435, XP003032170
    - EMERY P. ET AL, "Safety and tolerability of Rituximab retreatment in patients with active rheumatoid arthritis.", ARTHRITIS AND RHEUMATISM, (2005), vol. 52, no. SUPPL. 9 #860, page S341, XP003032171
    - "PUBLICATION SCHEDULE 2005", ARTHRITIS AND RHEUMATISM, (2005), vol. 52, no. 9,SUP, XP003035144
    - "RITUXIMAB IN RA: DANCER STUDY CONFIRMS EFFICACY", MEDSCAPE, VIENA, AUSTRIA, (20050614), pages 1 - 5, URL: HTTP://WWW.MEDSCAPE.COM/VIEWARTICLE/538249, XP003035145
    - PINCUS T. ET AL, "RELATIVE VERSUS ABSOLUTE GOALS OF THERAPIES FOR RA:ACR 20 OR ACR 50 RESPONSES VERSUS TARGET VALUES FOR "NEAR REMISSION" OF DAS OR SINGLE MEASURES", CLIN EXP RHEUMATOL., (2004), vol. 22, no. 5 SUP.35, pages S50 - S56, XP003035146
Opposition   - MEDSCAPE FLEISCHMANN et al., "Rituximab in RA: DANCER study confirms efficacy;", Preliminary Efficacy Results of Rituximab Retreatment in Patients with Active Rheumatoid Arthritis, (20050614), vol. 264;, page S 131;, XP003035145
    - EMERY et al., "Arthritis & Rheumatism,", Safety and Tolerability of Rituximab Retreatment in Patients with Active Rheumatoid Arthritis, (20050000), vol. 860;, page S341;, XP003032171
    - MEDSCAPE FLEISCHMANN et al., "Rituximab in RA: DANCER study confirms efficacy;", Preliminary Efficacy Results of Rituximab Retreatment in Patients with Active Rheumatoid Arthritis, (20050614), vol. 264, pages 1 - 5, XP003035145
    - EMERY et al., "Safety and Tolerability of Rituximab Retreatment in Patients with Active Rheumatoid Arthritis", OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN COLLEGE OF RHEUMATOLOGY, (20050000), vol. 860, page S341;, XP003032171