EP2000436 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR OBTAINING LIQUID SALT AND SALTS THUS OBTAINED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2012 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trisal S.A. Ctra. de Rubi, 250 08223 Terrassa (Barcelona) / ES | [2008/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOTTI SARDA, Jaume Trisal, SA Ctra. de Rubí, 250 E-08223 Terrassa / ES | 02 /
DOTTI SARDA, Josep, Lluis Trisal, SA Ctra. de Rubí, 250 E-08223 Terrassa / ES | [2008/50] | Representative(s) | Gislon, Gabriele Torner, Juncosa i Associats, S.L. C/Pau Claris, 108, 1r 1a 08009 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2008/50] | Gislon, Gabriele Torner, Juncosa i Associats, S.L. c/ Bruc, 21 08010 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 06847048.3 | 16.11.2006 | [2008/50] | WO2006ES00633 | Priority number, date | ES20060000291 | 09.02.2006 Original published format: ES 200600291 | [2008/50] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007090907 | Date: | 16.08.2007 | Language: | ES | [2007/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2000436 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 16.08.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C01D3/14, A23L1/22, C01D3/16, // A23L1/237 | [2011/43] | CPC: |
C01D3/16 (EP);
A23L27/00 (EP,ES);
A23L27/40 (EP);
C01D3/14 (EP,ES);
C01D3/22 (ES);
C02F1/52 (ES)
|
Former IPC [2008/50] | C01D3/14, C01D3/22, C02F1/52, A23L1/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM ERHALT VON FLÜSSIGEN SALZEN UND SO ERHALTENE SALZE | [2008/50] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR OBTAINING LIQUID SALT AND SALTS THUS OBTAINED | [2008/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR L'OBTENTION D'UN SEL LIQUIDE, ET SELS OBTENUS | [2008/50] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2008 | Translation filed | 04.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 04.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/50] | 25.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/42] | 01.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3155458 (FIEDELMAN HOWARD W, et al) [X] 1,4-6,10-14 * column 4, line 45 - line 70 * * column 1, line 12 - line 33 * [Y] 2,3,7-9; | [Y]DE1946637 (WALTER HANS) [Y] 7-9* page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 10; claims 1-3 *; | [XY]US4115219 (GANCY ALAN B, et al) [X] 1,4-6,10-14 * column 4, line 14 - column 7, line 56; figure 1 * [Y] 2,3,7-9; | [Y]DE4318875 (MOSTOFIZADEH GHALAMFARSA S M C [DE]) [Y] 2,3 * column 1, line 43 - column 3, line 63 *; | [XY]WO03035551 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL]) [X] 1,4-6,10-14 * page 4, line 18 - page 9, line 23 * [Y] 2,3,7-9 | International search | [A]US5814359 (OURA MASAMI [JP], et al); | [A]US5984981 (MIYAGI SHOWA [JP]); | [A]FR2862959 (EUROTEC DEV [FR]); | [A]ES355745 (SOLVAY [BE]) | by applicant | ES509961 | US2005123670 | ES1012193 | US5814359 |