EP1966974 - SECURE SYSTEM FOR INPUTTING AND PROCESSING AUTHENTICATION DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trusted Logic Mobility SAS 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [2015/04] |
Former [2012/23] | For all designated states Trusted Logic Mobility SAS 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | ||
Former [2011/18] | For all designated states Trusted Logic 6 rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | ||
Former [2008/37] | For all designated states TRUSTED LOGIC 5, rue du Bailliage 78000 Versailles / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LACAS, Samuel 13 Rue Delerue 92120 Montrouge / FR | 02 /
FREREBEAU, Laurent 86 Avenue De Paris 78000 Versailles / FR | [2008/37] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/04] | Robinson, Nigel Alexander Julian D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2010/23] | Cassagne, Philippe M.J. Gemalto SA Intellectual Property Department 6, rue de la Verrière 92197 Meudon Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2008/37] | Domenego, Bertrand Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06847111.9 | 21.12.2006 | [2008/37] | WO2006FR02836 | Priority number, date | FR20050013506 | 30.12.2005 Original published format: FR 0513506 | [2008/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007077348 | Date: | 12.07.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1966974 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1966974 | Date: | 21.01.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2008/37] | CPC: |
H04L63/0815 (EP);
H04L63/0853 (EP);
H04L63/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERES SYSTEM ZUM EINGEBEN UND VERARBEITEN VON AUTHENTIFIKATIONSDATEN | [2008/37] | English: | SECURE SYSTEM FOR INPUTTING AND PROCESSING AUTHENTICATION DATA | [2008/37] | French: | SYSTEME SECURISE DE SAISIE ET DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNEES D'AUTHENTIFICATION | [2008/37] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/37] | 24.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 05.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | 22.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.12.2006 | AT | 21.01.2015 | CY | 21.01.2015 | CZ | 21.01.2015 | DK | 21.01.2015 | EE | 21.01.2015 | ES | 21.01.2015 | FI | 21.01.2015 | IT | 21.01.2015 | LT | 21.01.2015 | LV | 21.01.2015 | MC | 21.01.2015 | NL | 21.01.2015 | PL | 21.01.2015 | PT | 21.01.2015 | RO | 21.01.2015 | SE | 21.01.2015 | SI | 21.01.2015 | SK | 21.01.2015 | TR | 21.01.2015 | BG | 21.04.2015 | GR | 22.04.2015 | IS | 21.05.2015 | [2018/34] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 21.12.2006 | |
AT | 21.01.2015 | ||
CY | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
TR | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 21.01.2015 | |
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 21.01.2015 | |
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 21.01.2015 | |
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 21.01.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2001000358 (ISOMICHI KOUSEI ET AL) [X] 1-9 * column A * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0074] * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2004193921 (BYRNE BARRY A) [A] 1-9 * column A * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0032] * * figure 3 *; | [A]WO03084127 (HAN, MIN-GYU) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * figure 2 * |