EP1968956 - CALCIUM CHANNEL ANTAGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.04.2009 [2009/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Icagen, Inc. P.O. Box 14487 Research Triangle Park North Carolina 27709 / US | [2008/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PACOFSKY, Gregory J. 510 Polk Street Raleigh, North Carolina 27604 / US | 02 /
SUTO, Mark J. 13038 Morehead Chapel Hill, North Carolina 27517 / US | 03 /
FRITCH, Paul Christopher 10822 Halesworth Drive Cary, North Carolina 27511 / US | [2008/38] | Representative(s) | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06848672.9 | 20.12.2006 | [2008/38] | WO2006US48925 | Priority number, date | US20050753596P | 22.12.2005 Original published format: US 753596 P | [2008/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007073497 | Date: | 28.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1968956 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07D417/12, A61K31/506, A61P9/10, A61P25/08, A61P25/14, A61P25/28 | [2008/43] | CPC: |
C07D417/12 (EP,US);
A61P11/16 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/06 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D277/28 (EP,US);
C07D277/34 (EP,US);
C07D277/36 (EP,US);
C07D277/46 (EP,US);
C07D277/54 (EP,US);
C07D277/56 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/38] | C07D277/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/38] | Extension states | AL | 10.07.2008 | BA | 10.07.2008 | HR | 10.07.2008 | MK | 10.07.2008 | RS | 10.07.2008 | Title | German: | CALCIUMKANALANTAGONISTEN | [2008/38] | English: | CALCIUM CHANNEL ANTAGONISTS | [2008/38] | French: | ANTAGONISTES DES CANAUX CALCIQUES | [2008/38] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2008 | Search fee paid | 10.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/38] | 20.02.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2007173504 (PACOFSKY GREGORY J [US], et al) |