EP1808947 - Isolated operation detecting method, control apparatus for detecting isolated operation for distributed power supply, isolated operation detecting apparatus, and distributed power supply [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.05.2015 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.06.2015 [2015/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OMRON CORPORATION 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/29] | For all designated states OMRON CORPORATION 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mabuchi, Masao c/o Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | 02 /
Toyoura, Nobuyuki c/o Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | 03 /
Oka, Seiji c/o Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | 04 /
Hosomi, Shinichi c/o Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | 05 /
Kato, Masaya c/o Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | 06 /
Imamura, Kazuyoshi c/o Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2013/45] |
Former [2008/01] | 01 /
Mabuchi, Masao Omron Corp 801,Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | ||
02 /
Toyoura, Nobuyuki Omron Corp 801,Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | |||
03 /
Oka, Seiji Omron Corp 801,Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | |||
04 /
Hosomi, Shinichi Omron Corp. 801, Minamifudodo-cho; Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | |||
05 /
Kato, Masaya Omron Corp. 801 Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | |||
06 /
Imamura, Kazuyoshi Omron Corp. 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | |||
Former [2007/46] | 01 /
Mabuchi, Masao Omron Corp 801,Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | ||
02 /
Toyoura, Nobuyuki Omron Corp 801,Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | |||
03 /
Oka, Seiji Omron Corp 801,Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | |||
04 /
Hosomi, Shinichi Omron Corp. 801, Minaminfudodo-cho; Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | |||
05 /
Kato, Masaya Omron Corp. Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | |||
06 /
Imamura, Kazuyoshi Omron Corp. 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | |||
Former [2007/38] | 01 /
Mabuchi, Masao Omron Corp 801,Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | ||
02 /
Toyoura, Nobuyuki Omron Corp 801,Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | |||
03 /
Oka, Seiji Omron Corp 801,Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | |||
04 /
Hosomi, Shinichi Omron Corp. 801, Minaminfudodo-cho; Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokoji-dori Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | |||
05 /
Kato, Masaya Omron Corp. Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | |||
06 /
Imamura, Kazuyoshi Omron Corp. 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru, Shioko Shimogoyo-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | |||
Former [2007/29] | 01 /
Mabuchi, Masao Omron Corp 801,Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | ||
02 /
Toyoura, Nobuyuki Omron Corp 801,Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | |||
03 /
Oka, Seiji Omron Corp 801,Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | |||
04 /
Hosomi, Shinichi c/o Omron Corp. 801, Minamifudo- do-cho, Horiakahigashiiru, Shiokoji-dori Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | |||
05 /
Kato, Masaya c/o Omron Corp. 801, Minamifudodo-ch Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | |||
06 /
Imamura, Kazuyoshi c/o Omrom Corp. 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru, Shioko Shimogoyo-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | Representative(s) | Kilian Kilian & Partner mbB Zielstattstraße 23a 81379 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | Kilian Kilian & Partner Aidenbachstraße 54 81379 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/29] | Kilian, Helmut Wilhelms, Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07000364.5 | 09.01.2007 | [2007/29] | Priority number, date | JP20060006108 | 13.01.2006 Original published format: JP 2006006108 | JP20060235572 | 31.08.2006 Original published format: JP 2006235572 | [2007/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1808947 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1808947 | Date: | 18.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/38, G01R19/25, H02J13/00, H02J1/00 | [2013/38] | CPC: |
H02J3/381 (EP,US);
H02J3/38 (KR);
H02J13/00 (EP,US);
G01R19/2513 (EP,US);
H02J2300/10 (EP);
H02J2300/24 (EP,US);
H02J2300/30 (EP,US);
H02J3/388 (EP,US);
Y02E10/56 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/29] | H02J3/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/29] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Inselbetriebserfassung, Steuervorrichtung zur Inselbetriebserfassung für eine verteilte Stromversorgung, Gerät zur Inselbetriebserfassung und verteilte Stromversorgung | [2007/29] | English: | Isolated operation detecting method, control apparatus for detecting isolated operation for distributed power supply, isolated operation detecting apparatus, and distributed power supply | [2007/29] | French: | Procédé de détection de fonctionnement isolé, appareil de contrôle de détection d'un fonctionnement isolé d'une alimentation électrique distribuée, appareil de détection de fonctionnement isolé, et alimentation électrique distribuée | [2007/29] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/17] | 18.05.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0444666 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-17* the whole document *; | [XI]US6219623 (WILLS ROBERT H [US]) [X] 1-3,13-17 * abstract * * figure 1 * * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 7 * * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 2 * * column 8, lines 24-50 * * column 13, line 21 - column 14, line 7 * * column 10, lines 14-63 * * column 4, lines 48-60 * [I] 4-12; | [A]US6429546 (ROPP MICHAEL EUGENE [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003080741 (LEROW KEVIN E [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003165036 (TULADHAR ANIL [CA]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004021470 (ADAMS LARRY L [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [I]US2005146224 (LIU YUNG-HSIANG [TW], et al) [I] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0038] - [0039] * |