|
22.01.2018 |
Request for change of client data cannot be registered anymore |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.2015 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2014 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2014 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.09.2014 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.02.2014 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2014 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.02.2014 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.02.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
02.12.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.11.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.11.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.10.2013 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.10.2013 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
17 |
|
21.08.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
10.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2013 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.05.2013 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
02.05.2013 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.2013 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2013 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.03.2011 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.01.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
26.10.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.10.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.09.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.09.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2010 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2010 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2010 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.09.2010 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.09.2010 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.06.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.02.2010 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.2009 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.2009 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2009 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.2009 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2009 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.07.2009 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
20.07.2009 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2009 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.06.2009 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
18.06.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.06.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2009 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2009 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2009 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
28.01.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.01.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.01.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.2009 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.05.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.04.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2008 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2007 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2007 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2007 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2007 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2007 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.04.2007 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.01.2007 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.01.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
18.01.2007 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2007 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.01.2007 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.01.2007 |
Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.06.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
33 |