EP1813406 - Sheet for regenerating a mold [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimo-hozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2007/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takashima, Kouichi c/o Nitto Electr. Kyushu Corp. 2307-2 Yoshida, Yoshinogari Kanzaki Saga 842-0031 / JP | [2007/31] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/31] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 07001647.2 | 25.01.2007 | [2007/31] | Priority number, date | JP20060019638 | 27.01.2006 Original published format: JP 2006019638 | JP20060019639 | 27.01.2006 Original published format: JP 2006019639 | JP20060287717 | 23.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006287717 | [2007/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1813406 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1813406 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B29C33/72 | [2007/31] | CPC: |
B29C45/72 (EP);
H01L21/48 (KR);
B08B1/00 (EP);
B08B7/0028 (EP);
B30B15/0082 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/31] | Title | German: | Folie zur Regenerierung eines Formwerkzeuges | [2007/31] | English: | Sheet for regenerating a mold | [2007/31] | French: | Feuille pour la régénération d'un moule | [2007/31] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/31] | 13.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 23.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.01.2007 | AT | 22.06.2011 | CY | 22.06.2011 | CZ | 22.06.2011 | DK | 22.06.2011 | EE | 22.06.2011 | FI | 22.06.2011 | IT | 22.06.2011 | LT | 22.06.2011 | LV | 22.06.2011 | PL | 22.06.2011 | RO | 22.06.2011 | SE | 22.06.2011 | SI | 22.06.2011 | SK | 22.06.2011 | TR | 22.06.2011 | BG | 22.09.2011 | GR | 23.09.2011 | ES | 03.10.2011 | IS | 22.10.2011 | PT | 24.10.2011 | IE | 25.01.2012 | LU | 25.01.2012 | CH | 31.01.2012 | FR | 31.01.2012 | LI | 31.01.2012 | MC | 31.01.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
TR | 22.06.2011 | ||
BG | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
ES | 03.10.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
LU | 25.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
FR | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
TR | 22.06.2011 | ||
BG | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
ES | 03.10.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
FR | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
BG | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
ES | 03.10.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
FR | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
ES | 03.10.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
FR | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
FR | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
FR | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 22.06.2011 | |
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 22.06.2011 | |
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 22.06.2011 | |
SE | 22.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0271107 (NITTO ELECTRIC IND CO [JP]) [X] 1,2,6-9 * figure 2 * * page 3, line 19 - line 23 * * page 6, line 10 - page 7, line 7 * * page 14, line 13 - line 26 * * page 17, line 14 - line 18 * [Y] 1,2,4,6-9; | [A]EP0342163 (FIAT AUTO SPA [IT]) [A] 1-9* abstract *; | [Y]JPH07304044 (TOSHIBA CHEM CORP) [Y] 1,2,4,6-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] , [0013] , [0016] * | by applicant | EP0271107 | JPH07304044 |