EP1958498 - Soil pot [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bremkens, Christian Hollesstraat 37 47608 Geldern - Walbeck / DE | [2008/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/34] | Representative(s) | Gesthuysen Patentanwälte Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 07003859.1 | 26.02.2007 | [2008/34] | Priority number, date | EP20070003298 | 16.02.2007 Original published format: EP 07003298 | [2008/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1958498 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A01G9/02 | [2008/34] | CPC: |
A01G9/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2009/18] |
Former [2008/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kulturtopf | [2008/34] | English: | Soil pot | [2008/34] | French: | Pot de culture | [2008/34] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/34] | 01.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE9112058U (GERTZ, DIETER, O-9071 CHEMNITZ, DE) [X] 1-5,8,9 * page 5; figure 1 *; | [X]JP2000116232 (KUDO FUMIO, et al) [X] 1-5,8 * figure 3 *; | [XY]DE19929409 (JAVANBAKHSH HASSAN AUCH HASAN [DE]) [X] 1-5,7-9 * abstract * [Y] 10; | [X]NL1019111C (IMP PROPERTY B V [NL]) [X] 1-9 * abstract *; | [Y]DE202005014193U (KROISS HERMANN [DE]) [Y] 10* abstract * | by applicant | DE20109317U | DE20206329U |