EP1835613 - System and method for motor speed estimation using hybrid model reference adaptive system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rockwell Automation Technologies, Inc. 1 Allen-Bradley Drive Mayfield Heights, OH 44124 / US | [2007/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lu, Haihui Room 7-1203, Block 7 Rui Hong Xin Cheng 333 Linping Street Shanghai 200086 / CN | 02 /
Qian, Wei 5-11-301 Vanke City Garden 3333 Qixin Road Shanghai 201101 / CN | [2016/47] |
Former [2007/38] | 01 /
Lu, Haihui Room 7-1203, Block 7, Rui Hong Xin Cheng, 333 Linping Street Shanghai 200086 / CN | ||
02 /
Qian, Wei 5-11-301 Vanke City Garden 3333 Qixin Road Shanghai 201101 / CN | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2016/47] |
Former [2008/28] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/38] | Englaender, Klaus, et al HML Patentanwälte Schraudolphstrasse 3 80799 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07004697.4 | 07.03.2007 | [2007/38] | Priority number, date | US20060375800 | 14.03.2006 Original published format: US 375800 | [2007/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1835613 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1835613 | Date: | 27.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1835613 | Date: | 23.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H02P31/00, H02P21/34, H02P21/32, H02P21/18, H02P21/14, H02P21/00, H02P21/20, H02P21/26 | [2016/21] | CPC: |
H02P21/0021 (EP,US);
H02P21/0017 (EP,US);
H02P21/141 (EP,US);
H02P21/18 (EP,US);
H02P21/20 (EP,US);
H02P21/26 (EP,US);
H02P21/32 (EP,US);
H02P21/34 (EP,US);
H02P2203/05 (EP,US);
H02P2203/09 (EP,US);
H02P2207/01 (EP,US);
H02P31/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/22] | H02P21/14, H02P21/00 | ||
Former IPC [2007/38] | H02P21/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2016/01] |
Former [2007/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zum Motorgeschwindigkeitsschätzung mittels eines adaptiven Hybridmodellreferenzsystems | [2007/38] | English: | System and method for motor speed estimation using hybrid model reference adaptive system | [2007/38] | French: | Système et procédé d'estimation de la vitesse d'un moteur utilisant un système adaptatif avec référence d'un modèle hybride | [2007/38] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/01] | 28.11.2015 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.01.2016 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - ROWAN T M ET AL, "A simple on-line adaptation for indirect field orientation of an induction machine", 19891001; 19891001 - 19891005, (19891001), pages 579 - 587, XP010090984 [A] 1-10 * pages 579-581; figures 1-2 * | [A] - JOACHIM HOLTZ, "Sensorless Control of Induction Motor Drives", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, IEEE. NEW YORK, US, (20020801), vol. 90, no. 8, ISSN 0018-9219, XP011065049 [A] 1-10 * page 1369; figures 14,15 * |