EP1834840 - Electronic control units for controlling in-vehicle devices using time-dependent data and vehicle control system integrating such units for real-time distributed control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2018/49] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | ||
For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | |||
Former [2007/38] | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | ||
For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-city Aichi-pref., 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shidai, Takahiro c/o DENSO CORPORATION Intellectual Property Department 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | 02 /
Miyamoto, Seiji c/o DENSO CORPORATION Intellectual Property Department 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | 03 /
Noda, Waka c/o DENSO CORPORATION Intellectual Property Department 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | 04 /
Ito, Ryo c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-city Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | 05 /
Hirano, Hiroyuki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-city Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | [2018/49] |
Former [2007/38] | 01 /
Shidai, Takahiro c/o Denso Corporation Intellectual Property Department 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | ||
02 /
Miyamoto, Seiji c/o Denso Corporation Intellectual Property Department 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | |||
03 /
Noda, Waka c/o Denso Corporation Intellectual Property Department 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | |||
04 /
Ito, Ryo c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-city Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | |||
05 /
Hirano, Hiroyuki c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-city Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/49] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2007/38] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 07005174.3 | 13.03.2007 | [2007/38] | Priority number, date | JP20060067202 | 13.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006067202 | [2007/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1834840 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1834840 | Date: | 05.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60R16/023, H04J3/06 | [2018/25] | CPC: |
B60R16/0231 (EP,US);
H04J3/0682 (EP,US);
H04J3/14 (EP,US);
H04L67/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/38] | B60R16/02, H04L29/08, G06F13/42 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2018/49] |
Former [2008/22] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektronische Steuereinheiten zur Steuerung in Fahrzeugen unter Verwendung von zeitabhängigen Daten und Fahrzeugsteuersystem mit derartigen Einheiten für verteilte Echtzeit-Steuerung | [2007/38] | English: | Electronic control units for controlling in-vehicle devices using time-dependent data and vehicle control system integrating such units for real-time distributed control | [2007/38] | French: | Unités de commande électrique pour la commande de dispositifs à bord du véhicule à l'aide de données dépendant de la durée et système de commande de véhicule intégrant lesdites unités pour la commande distribuée en temps réel | [2007/38] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/19] | 20.03.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.04.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 30.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE10218645 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [A] 1-25 * abstract * * paragraphs [0035] - [0037] - [0061]; figure 2; claims 1-3,5 *; | [A]US2004260788 (MIYANO KAZUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-25 * paragraphs [0004] - [0010] - [0016] - [0020] - [0088] , [0089] , [0093]; figures 6,7 *; | [DX]US2005159870 (TOHDO TETSUYA [JP], et al) [DX] 1-25 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0012] - [0017] - [0029] , [0030] , [0034] , [0038] - [0040] - [0060] , [0084] * * paragraphs [0089] , [0092] , [0093] *; | [X]US2005159869 (TOHDO TETSUYA [JP], et al) [X] 1,18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0005] , [0011] , [0013] - [0019] - [0045] - [0047] - [0052] , [0057] - [0060] * * paragraphs [0062] , [0069] - [0071] - [0073] , [0074] , [0080] , [0086] , [0090] - [0093] - [0103] * * paragraphs [0110] - [0112] *; | [DX]JP2005199954 (DENSO CORP) [DX] 1,18* abstract *; | [PA]EP1712424 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [PA] 1-25 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0008] , [0012] * | by applicant | JP2005199954 |