EP1795282 - Spray element with centrifugal atomization and air guidance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2011 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.10.2011 [2011/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Corporation One Henkel Way Rocky Hill, CT 06067 / US | [2010/42] |
Former [2007/24] | For all designated states ACHESON INDUSTRIES, INC. 511 Fort Street, Suite 315 Port Huron Michigan 48060 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Renkl, Hans-Dieter Maienweg 11 89189 Berghülen / DE | 02 /
Kok, Douwe-Marten Torum 8 9679 Scheemda / NL | 03 /
Junker, Thomas Starenweg 21 89150 Laichingen / DE | 04 /
Keim, Karl-Heinz Schlesierstrasse 10 89233 Neu-Ulm / DE | [2007/39] |
Former [2007/24] | 01 /
Renkl, Hans-Dieter Maienweg 11 89189 Berghülen / DE | ||
02 /
Kok, Douwe-Marten Torum 8 9679 Scheemda / NL | |||
03 /
Junker, Thomas Rassensteinstrasse 9 73571 Göggingen / DE | |||
04 /
Keim, Karl-Heinz Schlesierstrasse 10 89233 Neu-Ulm / DE | Representative(s) | Kucken, Stefan, et al Henkel AG & Co. KGaA VTP Patente 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/42] | Kucken, Stefan, et al Henkel AG & Co. KGaA VTP Patente 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2007/24] | Herzog, Markus, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07005291.5 | 21.09.1998 | [2007/24] | Priority number, date | DE1998110032 | 09.03.1998 Original published format: DE 19810032 | [2007/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1795282 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1795282 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B22D17/20, B05B3/10, B05B13/06, B05C9/14, B22D17/22 | [2007/24] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2007/24] | Title | German: | Zerstäuber mit zentrifugaler Zerstäubung und Luftführung | [2007/24] | English: | Spray element with centrifugal atomization and air guidance | [2007/24] | French: | Élément pulvérisateur à atomisation centrifuge et guidage d'air | [2007/24] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/24] | 16.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98117873.4 / EP0941788 | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 27.10.2010 | SE | 27.10.2010 | [2011/33] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2709110 (SCHMIDT WILLIAM E) [A] 1-33* the whole document *; | [X]US4380321 (CULBERTSON SAMUEL W, et al) [X] 1-33 * the whole document *; | [X]US4601921 (LEE HSAI-YIN [US]) [X] 1-33 * the whole document *; | [X]US4792094 (TACHI KAZUYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-33 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE2804633 | EP0037645 | US4601921 | DE4105116 | US5346486 |