EP1839604 - Device for performing examinations and surgical operations on the uterus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG Mittelstrasse 8 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/40] | For all designated states Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG Mittelstrasse 8 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Walter, Christian Scheffelstrasse 21 78576 Emmingen-Liptingen / DE | [2007/40] | Representative(s) | Weller, Wolfgang, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/40] | Weller, Wolfgang, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 07006115.5 | 24.03.2007 | [2007/40] | Priority number, date | DE20061016002 | 30.03.2006 Original published format: DE102006016002 | [2007/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1839604 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1839604 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/42, // A61B17/28 | [2007/40] | CPC: |
A61B17/4241 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2912 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2946 (EP,US);
A61B2017/4216 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/24] |
Former [2007/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Durchführen von Untersuchungen und chirurgischen Eingriffen an der Gebärmutter | [2007/40] | English: | Device for performing examinations and surgical operations on the uterus | [2007/40] | French: | Dispositif destiné à l'exécution de recherches et opérations chirurgicales de l'utérus | [2007/40] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/16] | 04.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.05.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 24.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5571115 (NICHOLAS DAVID A [US]) [A] 14,15* column 5, line 59 - column 6, line 4 *; | [A]DE19603981 (WOLF GMBH RICHARD [DE]) [A] 6,7,9-11 * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 47 *; | [A]DE20110921U (TROKAMED HENGSTLER GMBH [DE]) [A] 6,8-11 * page 8, line 32 - page 9, line 12 * * page 10, line 8 - line 16 *; | [X]WO02065924 (VAN HEERDEN MARCUS VINCENT [ZA]) [X] 1-5,8,15-18 * page 4, paragraph 10 - page 5, paragraph 3 * |