EP1895291 - Method for measuring the mass of a plasticizer and humidity in a filter rod [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/10] | Filter rod measuring station and method for measuring the mass of a plasticizer, humidity and/or the dry filter material in a filter rod | ||
[2014/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEWS Elektronik GmbH & Co. KG Sperberhorst 10 22459 Hamburg / DE | [2020/01] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states TEWS ELEKTRONIK Dipl.-Ing. Manfred Tews Sperberhorst 10 22459 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herrmann, Rainer Kottwitzstrasse 15 20253 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
Schlemm, Udo, Dr. Weidenstieg 10 20259 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
Sexauer, Wolfgang Harriet-Straub-Strasse 55 79100 Freiburg / DE | [2008/10] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [2019/41] |
Former [2008/37] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2008/10] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 41 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07007952.0 | 19.04.2007 | [2008/10] | Priority number, date | DE20061041191 | 30.08.2006 Original published format: DE102006041191 | DE20072001196U | 25.01.2007 Original published format: DE 202007001196 U | [2008/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1895291 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1895291 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01N22/00, G01N22/04, A24D3/02 | [2008/10] | CPC: |
G01N22/00 (EP,US);
A24C5/3412 (EP,US);
A24D3/0295 (EP,US);
G01N22/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/41] |
Former [2008/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Messung der Masse eines Weichmachers und der Feuchtigkeit in einem Filterstab | [2014/14] | English: | Method for measuring the mass of a plasticizer and humidity in a filter rod | [2014/14] | French: | Procédé de mesure de la masse d'un plastifiant et de l'humidité dans la tige d'un filtre | [2014/14] |
Former [2008/10] | Filterstabmessstation sowie Verfahren zur Messung der Masse eines Weichmachers, der Feuchtigkeit und/oder des trockenen Filtermaterials in einem Filterstab | ||
Former [2008/10] | Filter rod measuring station and method for measuring the mass of a plasticizer, humidity and/or the dry filter material in a filter rod | ||
Former [2008/10] | Station de mesure de la tige d'un filtre tout comme procédé de mesure de la masse d'un plastifiant, de l'humidité et/ou du matériau de filtre sec dans la tige d'un filtre | Examination procedure | 27.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 09.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 22.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2013 | Observations by third parties | 03.02.2014 | Observations by third parties | 13.02.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.04.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.04.2014 | Observations by third parties | 23.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 13.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Appeal following examination | 03.09.2014 | Appeal received No. T0225/15 | 26.11.2014 | Statement of grounds filed | 06.08.2018 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2018/32] | 05.10.2018 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2018/40] | 12.02.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | 12.02.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.02.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.04.2008 | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 19.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.04.2007 | CY | 09.10.2019 | CZ | 09.10.2019 | DK | 09.10.2019 | EE | 09.10.2019 | FI | 09.10.2019 | LT | 09.10.2019 | LV | 09.10.2019 | MC | 09.10.2019 | MT | 09.10.2019 | PL | 09.10.2019 | RO | 09.10.2019 | SE | 09.10.2019 | SI | 09.10.2019 | SK | 09.10.2019 | TR | 09.10.2019 | BG | 09.01.2020 | GR | 10.01.2020 | IS | 09.02.2020 | PT | 10.02.2020 | AT | 19.04.2020 | IE | 19.04.2020 | LU | 19.04.2020 | BE | 30.04.2020 | CH | 30.04.2020 | LI | 30.04.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2022/26] | CZ | 09.10.2019 | |
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
TR | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
AT | 19.04.2020 | ||
IE | 19.04.2020 | ||
LU | 19.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | CZ | 09.10.2019 | |
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
AT | 19.04.2020 | ||
IE | 19.04.2020 | ||
LU | 19.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | CZ | 09.10.2019 | |
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IE | 19.04.2020 | ||
LU | 19.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | CZ | 09.10.2019 | |
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
LU | 19.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 09.10.2019 | |
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
LU | 19.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | CZ | 09.10.2019 | |
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | CZ | 09.10.2019 | |
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 09.10.2019 | |
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 09.10.2019 | |
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | CZ | 09.10.2019 | |
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 09.10.2019 | |
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 09.10.2019 | |
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 09.10.2019 | |
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5214969 (ADKINS WAYNE B [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * column 2, line 5 - line 59 *; | [A]EP0642746 (INTERTABA SPA [IT]) [A] 1-22 * abstract * * page 2, line 1 - line 10 * * page 2, line 33 - line 36 *; | [DA]EP0889321 (TEWS ELEKTRONIK [DE]) [DA] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP1197746 (TEWS ELEKTRONIK DIPL ING MANFR [DE]) [DA] 1-22* the whole document *; | [X]WO2004065948 (D EXPL DES TABACS ET ALLUMETTE [FR], et al) [X] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102004010618 (HAUNI MASCHINENBAU AG [DE]) [A] 1-22 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0033]; figures 2,5,6 *; | [X] - SEXAUER W., HERRMANN R., SCHLEMM U., CAMM B., "Rapid determination of plasticiser content in filter rods at the making machine", ABSTRACTS OF PRESENTATIONS MADE AT THE 2003 CORESTA JOINT MEETING OF THE SMOKE SCIENCE AND PRODUCT TECHNOLOGY STUDY GROUPS, ABSTR. ST 31, Freiburg, Deutschland, (2003), URL: http://www.coresta.org/Past_Abstracts/Freiburg2003-SmokeTech.pdf, (20080121), XP002465510 [X] 1-22 * abstract * | [T] - BORGWALDT-KC, "Drop Through Station DT", (20080122), URL: http://www.borgwaldt.de/cms/front_content.php?idart=108&idcat=97&lang=2, (20080121), XP002465511 [T] 1-22 * the whole document * | Examination | - D L MASSART ET AL, "10.7 Multicomponent analysis by multiple linear regression", Handbook of Chemometrics and Qualimetrics Part A, AMSTERDAM, THE NETHERLANDS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE B. V., (20030101), pages 292 - 294, ISBN 978-0-44-489724-4, XP055083215 | - MATTHIAS OTTO, "6.2.3 Applications in multicomponent analysis", Chemometrics, WEINHEIM, GERMANY, WILEY-VCH, (19990101), pages 200 - 207, ISBN 978-3-52-729628-6, XP055083239 | - R W DWYER, "Predicting the Pressure Drops across Cellulose Acetate Filters", BEITRAGE ZUR TABAKFORSCHUNG INTERNATIONAL, (19860801), vol. 13, no. 4, pages 157 - 168, XP055083231 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2478/cttr-2013-0565 | - EBBE NYFORS AND PERTTI VAINIKAINEN, "INDUSTRIAL MICROWAVE SENSORS", INDUSTRIAL MICROWAVE SENSORS, XX, XX, (19890101), XP002334964 | - PAUL RUSLEMEYER, "5.2 CA filter tow for cigarette filters", MACROMOLECULAR SYMPOSIA, WILEY VCH VERLAG, WEINHEIM, DE, (20040101), vol. 2008, ISSN 1022-1360, pages 267 - 291, XP009114386 | by applicant | WO2004065948 | - SEXAUER W. ET AL., "Rapid determination of plasticiser content in filter rods a the smoking machine", CORESTA MEET. SMOKE SCI.-PROD. TECHNO GROUPS | other | DE10200320 | - "Training Manual " Cigarette Filter Rodmaking"", WORLD SMOKING PRODUCTS, (1984), pages 1 - 19, XP003033263 | - "Cerulean's 2nd Generation Instrumentation", CERULEAN PROJECT DELIGHT - PMG, (20030320), pages 1 - 48, XP003033264 | - KC-Automation, Inc. "Introduction the DT System", 03.01.1998, XP003033265 | - HERRMANN R. ET AL, "Mikrowellen- Feuchtemessung mit Resonatoren und Ihre Anwendungen", HERRMANN R. ET AL, KUPFER K., Materialfeuchtemessung, Expert Verlag, (1997), XP003033266 | - HERRMANN R. ET AL, "FEUCHTEMESSUNG MIT MIKROWELLEN-RESONATOREN", TECHNISCHES MESSEN TM, (19971101), vol. 64, no. 11, pages 447 - 452, XP000738914 |