EP1900343 - Stent valves [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/12] | Stent valves and uses of same | ||
[2015/25] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2022 | Revocation of patent | published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cook Biotech Incorporated 3055 Kent Avenue West Lafayette, IN 47906 / US | [2015/25] |
Former [2008/12] | For all designated states Cook Biotech, Inc. 3055 Kent Avenue West Lafayette, IN 47906 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Obermiller, Joseph F. 1906 Blueberry Lane West Lafayette, IN 47906 / US | 02 /
Osse, Francisco, Jose Rua Ferreira de Araujo, 496 Apt. 52 CEP-05428001, San Paulo, SP/BR / BR | 03 /
Thorpe, Patricia, E. 5 Woodlands Hts NE Iowa City, IA 52240 / US | [2015/43] |
Former [2008/12] | 01 /
Obermiller, Joseph F. 1906 Blueberry Lane West Lafayette, IN 47906 / US | ||
02 /
Osse, Francisco, Jose Rua Ferreira de Araujo, 496, Apt. 52 CEP-05428001, San Paulo, SP/BR / BR | |||
03 /
Thorpe, Patricia, E. 5 Woodlands Hts NE Iowa City, IA 52240 / US | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/38] | Atkinson, Peter Birch, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | ||
Former [2008/12] | Atkinson, Peter Birch, et al MARKS & CLERK Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 07008364.7 | 31.01.2001 | [2008/12] | Priority number, date | US20000179195P | 31.01.2000 Original published format: US 179195 P | [2008/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1900343 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1900343 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | [2008/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1900343 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/24 | [2008/12] | CPC: |
A61F2/2475 (EP);
A61F2/2418 (EP);
A61F2220/0008 (EP);
A61F2220/0016 (EP);
A61F2220/005 (EP);
A61F2220/0075 (EP);
A61F2230/0054 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2015/43] |
Former [2008/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Stentklappen | [2015/25] | English: | Stent valves | [2015/25] | French: | Valvules d'endoprothèse vasculaire | [2015/25] |
Former [2008/12] | Stentklappen und Verwendungen davon | ||
Former [2008/12] | Stent valves and uses of same | ||
Former [2008/12] | Valvules d'endoprothèse vasculaire et ses utilisations | Examination procedure | 05.07.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 23.08.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 24.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/45] | 04.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2010 | Observations by third parties | 23.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 03.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.05.2015 | 20.05.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01905265.3 / EP1255510 | Divisional application(s) | EP10012515.2 / EP2329796 | EP10013161.4 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 03.11.2010 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010905265) is 25.02.2004 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.07.2016
08.07.2016
ADMISSIBLE Boston Scientific Corporation 300 Boston Scientific Way Marlborough, MA 01752-1234 / US Opponent's representative Peterreins Schley, et al, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Hermann-Sack-Straße 3 80331 München / DE | 02
21.07.2016
27.07.2016
ADMISSIBLE St Jude Med, Inc/Abbott Med GmbH/St Jude Med UK Ltd /SJM Int, Inc./SJM Coord Center BVBA/St Jude Med S C Inc 1 St Jude Med Dr/Helfmann Pk/Capulet House/1 St Jude Med Dr/Da Vincilaan/ 6300 Bee Cave Rd St Paul MN 55117/65760 Eschborn/S upon A CV37 7GX St Paul MN 55117/1935 ZaventEm/Austin TX 78746 / US Opponent's representative LKGLOBAL Lorenz & Kopf Patentanwalt Attorney at Law PartG mbB Brienner Straße 11 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.07.2016
08.07.2016
ADMISSIBLE Boston Scientific Corporation 300 Boston Scientific Way Marlborough, MA 01752-1234 / US Opponent's representative Peterreins Schley, et al, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hermann-Sack-Strasse 3 80331 München / DE | ||
02
21.07.2016
27.07.2016
ADMISSIBLE St Jude Med, Inc/Abbott Med GmbH/St Jude Med UK Ltd /SJM Int, Inc./SJM Coord Center BVBA/St Jude Med S C Inc 1 St Jude Med Dr/Helfmann Pk/Capulet House/1 St Jude Med Dr/Da Vincilaan/ 6300 Bee Cave Rd St Paul MN 55117/65760 Eschborn/S upon A CV37 7GX St Paul MN 55117/1935 ZaventEm/Austin TX 78746 / US Opponent's representative LKGLOBAL Lorenz & Kopf PartG mbB Patentanwälte Brienner Straße 11 80333 München / DE | |||
Former [2016/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.07.2016
08.07.2016
ADMISSIBLE Boston Scientific Corporation 300 Boston Scientific Way Marlborough, MA 01752-1234 / US Opponent's representative Peterreins Schley, et al, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hermann-Sack-Strasse 3 80331 München / DE | ||
02
21.07.2016
27.07.2016
ADMISSIBLE St.Jude Med, Inc./St.Jude Med GmbH/St.Jude Med UK Ltd/SJM Int., Inc./SJM Int., Inc./SJM Coord. Center BVBA/St.Jude Med S.C., Inc./ 1St.JudeMedDr./Elisenstr.3/Helfmann-Park C.House,Banbury Rd/St.JudeMed Dr. 1209OrangeSt./DaVincilaan11BxF1 6300 BeeCaveRd./St JudeMedDr St Paul, MN55117/80335Muc/65760Es MN55117/DE19801/BE1935/TX78746/MN55117 / US Opponent's representative Kopf Westenberger Wachenhausen Patentanwälte PartG mbB Brienner Straße 11 80333 München / DE | |||
Former [2016/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.07.2016
ADMISSIBLE Boston Scientific Corporation 300 Boston Scientific Way Marlborough, MA 01752-1234 / US Opponent's representative Peterreins Schley, et al, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hermann-Sack-Strasse 3 80331 München / DE | 31.08.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.01.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.03.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.04.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 30.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 07.07.2022 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2022/39] | Appeal following opposition | 10.07.2018 | Appeal received No. T1810/18 | 10.09.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 06.09.2021 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2021/36] | 07.07.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 19.08.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 07.07.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 03.09.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 03.09.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.09.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 26.08.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 26.08.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.09.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.10.2015 | BE | 21.10.2015 | CY | 21.10.2015 | DK | 21.10.2015 | ES | 21.10.2015 | FI | 21.10.2015 | IT | 21.10.2015 | MC | 21.10.2015 | NL | 21.10.2015 | SE | 21.10.2015 | TR | 21.10.2015 | GR | 22.01.2016 | CH | 31.01.2016 | LI | 31.01.2016 | LU | 31.01.2016 | FR | 01.02.2016 | PT | 22.02.2016 | GB | 30.01.2021 | IE | 31.01.2021 | [2021/22] |
Former [2021/20] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
TR | 21.10.2015 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
LU | 31.01.2016 | ||
FR | 01.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
IE | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2018/33] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
TR | 21.10.2015 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
LU | 31.01.2016 | ||
FR | 01.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
LU | 31.01.2016 | ||
FR | 01.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
LU | 31.01.2016 | ||
FR | 01.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
LU | 31.01.2016 | ||
FR | 01.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
LU | 31.01.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
LU | 31.01.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
LU | 31.01.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 21.10.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0808614 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-5,12,17,23,26,30,37 * figure -; claim - *; | [X]US5855601 (BESSLER MARC [US], et al) [X] 1-5,12-14,17,18,21,23,26-28,30,37 * figure -; claim - *; | [X]WO9915224 (KHOSRAVI FARHAD [US]) [X] 1,6-9,12,21,23,26,28,30,37 * page 5, line 23 - page 6, line 11; figure -; claim - *; | [X]EP0850607 (CORDIS CORP [US]) [X] 1,12-14,17,18,21,23,26,27,30,37 * column 1, line 3 - line 9; figure - * * column 15, line 22 - line 49 * | other | US5855597 | US5545214 | DE19904975 | US5480424 | WO9829057 | Opposition | US179195 | WO0154625 | EP1255510 | EP1900343 | US4580568 | US5411552 | WO0044313 | WO0119285 | EP1229865 | WO9930646 | EP0051451 | US5855601 | WO9829057 | EP0856300 | US5480424 | US5861028 | US4172295 | US5855597 | - Declaration of the inventors signed in September 2002 | - ANDERSEN et al., "Transluminal implantation of artificial heart valves. Description of a new expandable aortic valve and initial results with implantation by catheter technique in closed chest pigs", European Heart Journal, (19920000), vol. 13, pages 704 - 708, XP055293964 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/oxfordjournals.eurheartj.a060238 | - PAVCNIK et al., "Aortic and venous valve for percutaneous insertion", Minimally Invasive Therapy & Allied Technologies, (20000000), vol. 9, pages 3 - 4 , 287- 292, XP055293966 | - PAVCNIK D. et al., "Aortic and venous valve for percutaneous insertion", Minimally Invasive Therapy & Allied Technologies, (20000000), vol. 9, no. 3-4, pages 287 - 292, XP055293966 | - MARTIN, CAITLIN et al., "Significant differences in the material properties between aged human and porcine aortic tissues.", European Journal of Cardio-Thoracic Surgery, (20110000), vol. 40, no. 1, pages 28 - 34, XP028228427 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejcts.2010.08.056 | - SAUREN, A. A. H. J. et al., "The mechanical properties of porcine aortic valve tissues.", Journal of biomechanics, (19830000), vol. 16, no. 5, pages 327 - 337, XP022916561 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0021-9290(83)90016-7 | - GUNDIAH, NAMRATA et al., "Asymmetric mechanical properties of porcine aortic sinuses.", The Annals of thoracic surgery, (20080000), vol. 85, no. 5, pages 1631 - 1638, XP022625569 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.athoracsur.2008.01.035 | - GUNDIAH, NAMRATA et al., "Significant material property differences between the porcine ascending aorta and aortic sinuses.", Journal of Heart Valve Disease, (20080000), vol. 17, no. 6, pages 606 - 613, XP055296303 | - Katzen B T, "Current status of endovascular stent grafts: an overview of applications and devices.", Katzen B T, Adam A. et al., Textbook of metallic stents, pages 73-84,22 - 228, XP055296306 |