EP1992374 - Dispensing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim / DE | [2008/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rohrschneider, Marc Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Ginger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim / DE | 02 /
Besseler, Jens Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim / DE | 03 /
von Brunn, Timo Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim / DE | 04 /
Thoemmes, Ralf Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim / DE | 05 /
Dunne, Stephen, T. The Cottage Great Finborough Stowmarket Suffolk 1P14 3AE / GB | [2008/47] | Representative(s) | Gesthuysen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Huyssenallee 68 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Huyssenallee 100 45128 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 07009798.5 | 16.05.2007 | [2008/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1992374 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61M15/00 | [2008/47] | CPC: |
A61M15/0045 (EP,US);
A61M11/001 (EP,US);
A61M15/0003 (EP,US);
A61M15/0031 (EP,US);
A61M15/0036 (EP,US);
A61M15/0061 (EP,US);
A61M15/0075 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0021 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0027 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0039 (EP,US);
A61M2202/064 (EP,US);
A61M2205/07 (EP,US);
A61M2205/8225 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | [2009/30] |
Former [2008/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Abgabevorrichtung | [2008/47] | English: | Dispensing device | [2008/47] | French: | Dispositif distributeur | [2008/47] | Examination procedure | 20.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/46] | 25.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9511715 (TENAX CORP [US]) [A] 6* page 17, line 3 - page 20, line 7; figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO0117595 (INNOVATA BIOMED LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,7-12,14-18 * page 7, line 14 - page 10, line 6 *; | [Y]WO2006037636 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM MICROPART [DE], et al) [Y] 1-18 * page 11, line 4 - line 27; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP1655050 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-18 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0032]; figures 1-6 *; | [X]WO2007018568 (MANTA DEVICES LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * page 7, line 16 - page 24, line 24; figures 1a-13b * |