EP1870252 - Envelope flap closing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pitney Bowes, Inc. 1, Elmcroft Road Stamford, CT 06926 / US | [2007/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Allen, Robert J. 3 Buttercup Lane Shelton Connecticut 06484 / US | 02 /
Lyga, Thomas M. 112 Settlers Hill Road Southbury Connecticut 06488 / US | 03 /
Baldino, Neil F. 18 Gelding Hill Road Sandy Hook Connecticut 06482 / US | [2007/52] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/52] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07010338.7 | 24.05.2007 | [2007/52] | Priority number, date | US20060471161 | 20.06.2006 Original published format: US 471161 | [2007/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1870252 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1870252 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | [2008/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1870252 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B43M5/04 | [2007/52] | CPC: |
B43M5/042 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1051 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2008/40] |
Former [2007/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System zum Verschliessen von Briefumschlägen | [2007/52] | English: | Envelope flap closing system | [2007/52] | French: | Système de rabat d'une enveloppe | [2007/52] | Examination procedure | 20.05.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 24.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0825037 (HADEWE BV [NL]); | [A]US6041569 (FREEMAN GERALD C [US], et al); | [A]US6346149 (GREGOIRE JEAN-PIERRE [FR], et al); | [PX]EP1674290 (NEOPOST SA [FR]) | by applicant | US2006220307 |