|
08.12.2016 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.2016 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2016 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.11.2016 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.11.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.09.2016 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.09.2016 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.09.2016 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.09.2016 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
42 |
|
22.08.2016 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2016 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.2016 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
29.02.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.02.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
10 |
|
29.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
7 |
|
29.02.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.02.2016 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
10.11.2015 |
F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) |
Appeal |
18 |
|
14.08.2015 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.2014 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2014 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2014 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
12 |
|
27.01.2014 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
30.11.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
18 |
|
30.10.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.2012 |
F3348 Confirmation of withdrawal of the opposition by the respondent and former opponent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.2012 |
F3348 Confirmation of withdrawal of the opposition by the respondent and former opponent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.2012 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.2012 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.10.2012 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.10.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.10.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.10.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Appeal |
320 |
|
01.10.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Appeal |
59 |
|
01.10.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.10.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.10.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Appeal |
53 |
|
01.10.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Appeal |
53 |
|
01.10.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Appeal |
200 |
|
01.10.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
01.10.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Appeal |
133 |
|
01.10.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Appeal |
93 |
|
01.10.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.10.2012 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Appeal |
6 |
|
01.10.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Appeal |
97 |
|
01.10.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
01.10.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
01.10.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
27 |
|
01.10.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
01.10.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
01.10.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
01.10.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
01.10.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
01.10.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
01.10.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
01.10.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
10.09.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2012 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
23.07.2012 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2012 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
38 |
|
23.07.2012 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
23.07.2012 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.07.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.07.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2012 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2012 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
29 |
|
19.06.2012 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
18.06.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.06.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.06.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.06.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
01.06.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.06.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.05.2012 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.05.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.05.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
53 |
|
18.05.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
133 |
|
18.05.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.05.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
7 |
|
18.05.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
18.05.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
18.05.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
18.05.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
10 |
|
18.05.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
7 |
|
18.05.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
18.05.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
18.05.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
18.05.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
10 |
|
18.05.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
18.05.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
10 |
|
18.05.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
18.05.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
18.05.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.05.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
18.05.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
30 |
|
03.04.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2012 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.2012 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.03.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.02.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.02.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.02.2012 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.02.2012 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.02.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2011 |
Request for acceleration of opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2011 |
General enquiry |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.08.2011 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
15.10.2010 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.10.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2010 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.09.2010 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
55 |
|
27.05.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2010 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.04.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.04.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
12.04.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
320 |
|
12.04.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.04.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
93 |
|
12.04.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
63 |
|
12.04.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
12.04.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
12.04.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
12.04.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
12.04.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
12.04.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
12.04.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
12.04.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
12.04.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
12.04.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
12.04.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
27 |
|
18.06.2009 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.03.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2009 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.03.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
02.03.2009 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.03.2009 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
71 |
|
28.08.2008 |
Notice on debiting of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2008 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.08.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.04.2008 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2008 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.01.2008 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2008 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2008 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.08.2007 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2007 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
27.06.2007 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
27.06.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
27.06.2007 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2007 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
27.06.2007 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.06.2007 |
Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
08.04.2002 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
58 |
|
08.04.2002 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
08.04.2002 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
52 |
|
08.04.2002 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
46 |