|
10.09.2019 |
Payment submission rejected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2019 |
Request for change of client data cannot be registered anymore |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2018 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.02.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.02.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2018 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
06.02.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.2017 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.11.2017 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
139 |
|
27.11.2017 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
27.11.2017 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.11.2017 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.11.2017 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.09.2017 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2017 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2017 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2017 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.08.2017 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.07.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.07.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.07.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
12.07.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.05.2017 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2017 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.2017 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.2017 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2016 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.08.2016 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
02.06.2015 |
Confirmation of the receipt of third party observations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.2015 |
F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.05.2015 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Confirmation of the receipt of third party observations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2014 |
F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2014 |
Receipt of third party observations during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
13.08.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2012 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.03.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2012 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.02.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.02.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.02.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.02.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.02.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.02.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.02.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
13.01.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.11.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.11.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.11.2011 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2011 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.11.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
24.11.2011 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.12.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.12.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.12.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
10.12.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.11.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.08.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.12.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
17.12.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.12.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.10.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.04.2008 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.03.2008 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2008 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2008 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2008 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.02.2008 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.10.2007 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2007 |
Communication on invalid designation/extension/validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2007 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2007 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2007 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
06.08.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
06.08.2007 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2007 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2007 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.08.2007 |
Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
17.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
57 |