|
10.04.2015 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2015 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2015 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2015 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.03.2015 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.03.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.02.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2015 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.02.2015 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.12.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2014 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.12.2014 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2014 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
11.12.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.11.2014 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.11.2014 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.11.2014 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.10.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.10.2014 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
21.10.2014 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
20.10.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.10.2014 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.09.2014 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.2014 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2014 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2014 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.2014 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.09.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.09.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.08.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.08.2014 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.2014 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
6 |
|
05.08.2014 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
31.07.2014 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.04.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2014 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
14.04.2014 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
05.03.2014 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2013 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
10.12.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
07.10.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2013 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.09.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.08.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.08.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.08.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2013 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.08.2013 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2013 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
05.08.2013 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
05.08.2013 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.08.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.08.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2013 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2013 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
05.08.2013 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.03.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.03.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.03.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.03.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.03.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.03.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
22.03.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.03.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.03.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.03.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.03.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.03.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.03.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
03.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2012 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.11.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.11.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.11.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.11.2012 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.11.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.07.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
17.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
13.07.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
13.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
19.04.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.02.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2012 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2012 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.09.2011 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.09.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
14.09.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
14.09.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
14.09.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
14.09.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
14.09.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
14.09.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
14.09.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
14.09.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
14.09.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
14.09.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
14.09.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
74 |
|
14.09.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
14.09.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
14.09.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.11.2010 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.10.2010 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.10.2010 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2010 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.06.2010 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2010 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.06.2010 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2010 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
23.06.2010 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2009 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.07.2009 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.07.2009 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.04.2009 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.03.2009 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2009 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.03.2009 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.02.2009 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2008 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2008 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2007 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2007 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
05.10.2007 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
21.08.2007 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.08.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
21.08.2007 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2007 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.08.2007 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2007 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |