|
01.02.2023 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2022 |
Decision revoking the European Patent (patent proprietor) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.11.2022 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.07.2022 |
Communication concerning surcharge and failure to observe time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.02.2022 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.02.2022 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.02.2022 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2021 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.04.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
107 |
|
02.04.2020 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.04.2020 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.04.2020 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.04.2020 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2020 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.04.2020 |
OPPODREX with handwritten amendments |
Opposition |
97 |
|
10.03.2020 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2020 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.02.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
6 |
|
14.02.2020 |
Description |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.02.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2020 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.01.2020 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2020 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2020 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.01.2020 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.2019 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
14.11.2019 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.09.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.09.2019 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.2019 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.08.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.08.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.08.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.08.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.08.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.08.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.08.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.08.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.08.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.08.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.08.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.08.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.08.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.08.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
08.08.2019 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.2019 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
9 |
|
24.05.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.05.2019 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2019 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.05.2019 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.2019 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2019 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.11.2017 |
Request concerning representative opponent |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.11.2017 |
Request for change of name -opponent |
Appeal |
69 |
|
22.04.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.04.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.04.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.04.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.04.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.04.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.04.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.04.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.04.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.04.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.04.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.04.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.04.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.04.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.04.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.04.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.04.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.04.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.04.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.04.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.04.2016 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
22.04.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
08.04.2016 |
F3348 Confirmation of withdrawal of the opposition by the respondent and former opponent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2016 |
F3348 Confirmation of withdrawal of the opposition by the respondent and former opponent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.04.2016 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.10.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.10.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2015 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
11.06.2015 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
08.05.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2015 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.04.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.2015 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.04.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
15 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
95 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2015 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
8 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
25 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
7 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
20 |
|
25.11.2014 |
Refund of fees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.11.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.11.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.11.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
109 |
|
17.11.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
17.11.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
88 |
|
17.11.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2014 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
12.11.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
30.05.2014 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2014 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.05.2014 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.05.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.05.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.05.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
16.01.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.01.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
13.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.09.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.2013 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.09.2013 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.09.2013 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
17.06.2013 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2013 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.06.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2013 |
Request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.2013 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
53 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
92 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
89 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
47 |
|
10.08.2012 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2012 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.2012 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.06.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.02.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.02.2012 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.02.2012 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2012 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
173 |
|
19.12.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
19.12.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.2011 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2011 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.05.2011 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.11.2010 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.10.2010 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2010 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.10.2010 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.09.2010 |
Reply to the invitation to clarify the claims/the subject matter of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2010 |
Invitation to indicate the claims to be searched |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.2008 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2008 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2008 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
128 |
|
03.03.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
95 |
|
28.12.2007 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
28.12.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
182 |
|
28.12.2007 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.2007 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.2007 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
8 |