EP1878355 - Method for manufacturing brushes and device applied trereby [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GB Boucherie, naamloze vennootschap Stuivenbergstraat 106 8870 Izegem / BE | [2010/41] |
Former [2010/29] | For all designated states GB BOUCHERIE Stuivenbergstraat 106 8870 Izegem / BE | ||
Former [2008/03] | For all designated states FIRMA G.B. BOUCHERIE, naamloze vennootschap Stuivenbergstraat 106 8870 Izegem / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boucherie, Bart Gerard Ambachtenstraat 84 B-8870 Izegem / BE | [2008/03] | Representative(s) | Donné, Eddy, et al Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv. Arenbergstraat 13 2000 Antwerpen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/29] | Donné, Eddy, et al M.F.J.Bockstael Arenbergstraat 13 2000 Anvers / BE | ||
Former [2008/03] | Donné, Eddy M.F.J.Bockstael Arenbergstraat 13 2000 Anvers / BE | Application number, filing date | 07075506.1 | 22.06.2007 | [2008/03] | Priority number, date | BE20060000382 | 12.07.2006 Original published format: BE 200600382 | [2008/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1878355 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1878355 | Date: | 10.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A46B3/06, A46D3/04 | [2008/03] | CPC: |
A46D3/045 (EP,US);
A46B3/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, IT, LI [2008/39] |
Former [2008/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Bürsten und dabei verwendete Vorrichtung | [2008/03] | English: | Method for manufacturing brushes and device applied trereby | [2008/03] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de brosses et dispositif appliqué | [2008/03] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/13] | 18.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 28.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.03.2008 | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 21.01.2013 | CH | 30.06.2013 | LI | 30.06.2013 | [2014/20] |
Former [2013/22] | ES | 21.01.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0472863 (CORONET WERKE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-7* column 17, line 13 - column 18, line 48; figure 6 *; | [DY]EP0972465 (BOUCHERIE NV G B [BE]) [DY] 1-7 * paragraphs [0036] , [0037]; figures 14-17 * |