EP1883136 - Combined cable guiding/clamping device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2012 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.01.2013 [2013/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Necto Group S.r.l. Via Lago Maggiore, 43 36077 Altavilla (VI) / IT | [2008/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pizzi, Giordano Via Solari, 9 20144 Milano / IT | [2008/05] | Representative(s) | Raimondi, Margherita, et al Dott. Ing. Prof. Alfredo Raimondi S.r.l. Piazzale Cadorna, 15 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/05] | Raimondi, Margherita, et al Dott. Ing. Prof. Alfredo Raimondi S.r.l., Piazzale Cadorna, 15 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 07075561.6 | 05.07.2007 | [2008/05] | Priority number, date | IT2006MI01497 | 28.07.2006 Original published format: IT MI20061497 | [2008/05] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1883136 | Date: | 30.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1883136 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/58, H01R13/74 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
H01R13/5812 (EP,US);
H01R13/745 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/05] | H01R13/58 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/05] | Title | German: | Kombinierte Kabelführungs-/Klemmvorrichtung | [2008/05] | English: | Combined cable guiding/clamping device | [2008/05] | French: | Dispositif de fixation/guidage de câble combiné | [2008/05] | Examination procedure | 14.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/48] | 17.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/03] | 14.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.12.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2259462 (TECHNILEC SARL [FR]) [Y] 7-24 * page 3, line 10 - page 4, line 27; figures 1,2 *; | [XY]FR2529024 (DOMAR SA [ES]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 3 - page 4, line 22; figures 1-12 * [Y] 2-30; | [Y]FR2637740 (SIMON HANS [DE]) [Y] 2-6,25-30 * page 5, line 21 - page 6, line 17; figures 4-6 * * abstract *; | [A]GB2342508 (R W DATA LTD [GB]) [A] 21 * page 7, line 18 - line 20; figure 8 *; | [A]US2006148302 (PATEL SATISH I [US], et al) [A] 13 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024]; figures 7,9 *; | [XP]EP1798821 (MBM ELETTRONICA S R L [IT]) [XP] 1-30* the whole document * | by applicant | FR2259024 | IT1317965 |