EP1821163 - Timepiece with generator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ventura Watch SA Stettbachstr. 6 8600 Dübendorf / CH | [2011/32] |
Former [2007/34] | For all designated states Ventura Design on Time 8604 Volketswil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nobs, Pierre Im Blattacher 14 8602, Wangen / CH | [2007/34] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2014/01] |
Former [2011/32] | Münch, Martin Walter E. Blum & Co. AG Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2011/32] | P&TS Patents & Technology Surveys SA Case Postale 2848 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | ||
Former [2007/34] | P&TS Patents & Technology Surveys SA Postfach 2848 CH-2001 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 07100376.8 | 11.01.2007 | [2007/34] | Priority number, date | CH20060000223 | 13.02.2006 Original published format: CH 2232006 | [2007/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1821163 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1821163 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G04C10/00, G04B45/02, G04G19/12 | [2012/24] | CPC: |
G04B45/02 (EP,US);
G04C10/00 (EP,US);
G04G19/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/34] | G04C10/00, G04B45/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/34] | Title | German: | Uhr mit Generator | [2007/34] | English: | Timepiece with generator | [2007/34] | French: | Montre avec génératarice | [2007/34] | Examination procedure | 26.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/02] | 21.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/33] | 07.04.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/33] | Public notification(s) | Notification établie conformément à la règle 142 CBE (Reprise de la procédure conformément à la règle 142 (2) CBE en date du 17.03.2021) | Ventura Watch SA Stettbachstr. 6 8600 Dübendorf / CH | [2021/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.12.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.09.2021 | 08   M06   Not yet paid | 01.09.2021 | 09   M06   Not yet paid | 01.09.2021 | 10   M06   Not yet paid | 01.09.2021 | 11   M06   Not yet paid | 01.09.2021 | 12   M06   Not yet paid | 01.09.2021 | 13   M06   Not yet paid | 01.09.2021 | 14   M06   Not yet paid | 01.09.2021 | 15   M06   Not yet paid | 31.01.2022 | 16   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 23.08.2007 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2009/04] | 28.10.2013 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2013/50] | 01.09.2021 | Resumption of proceedings | [2021/09] | 28.10.2013 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2021/09] | 01.04.2011 | Resumption of proceedings | [2011/08] | 23.08.2007 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2011/08] | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JPH1172580 (SEIKO INSTR INC) [X] 1-3,7,18 * paragraphs [0003] - [0006] * * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] * * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] * * paragraphs [0018] - [0020] * * figures 2-4 * [Y] 8-15 [I] 4-6,16,17; | [A]CH685363 (ERIC-M. GRANDJEAN; GRANDJEAN ERIC-M) [A] 1-18 * column 1, line 29 - column 2, line 37 *; | [A]US4910720 (RAY CLAUDE [CH], et al) [A] 1-18 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US6441516 (KAELIN LAURENT [CH], et al) [A] 1-18 * column 2, line 15 - column 3, line 12 *; | [A]EP0683442 (MONDAINE WATCH LTD [CH]) [A] 8,17 * claim 1 *; | [A]JPS5326169 ; | [A]GB421770 (LOUIS CARTIER) [A] 1-18 * figures 1-3; claims 1-5 *; | [Y]EP1372048 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [Y] 8-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1341062 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [Y] 8-15 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19780509), vol. 002, no. 061, Database accession no. (E - 031), & JP53026169 A 19780310 (SEIKO INSTR & ELECTRONICS LTD) [A] 17 * abstract * |