|
24.01.2019 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2019 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2019 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2019 |
Clean copy of claims in the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.01.2019 |
Clean copy of description pages in the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.01.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2019 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.2019 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.01.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.01.2019 |
Description |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.01.2019 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.01.2019 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.01.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.10.2018 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.10.2018 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.10.2018 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.09.2018 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.07.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.2018 |
OPPODREX with handwritten amendments |
Opposition |
13 |
|
29.06.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.06.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2018 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
18 |
|
27.06.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Claims submitted during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Description submitted during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.05.2018 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2018 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2018 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
29.03.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2018 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
15 |
|
20.03.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
14 |
|
20.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.03.2018 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.02.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.02.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.02.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.02.2018 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
20 |
|
06.02.2018 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.01.2018 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.2017 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.2017 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.01.2017 |
General enquiry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.05.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
4 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
9 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
11 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
9 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
8 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
9 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
12 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
11 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
11 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
10 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
7 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
11 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
10 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
10 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
11 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
8 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
11 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
8 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
10 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
8 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
11 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
11 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
8 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
7 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
9 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
10 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
10 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
7 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
7 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
7 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
25.01.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2016 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
28 |
|
18.01.2016 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
30 |
|
14.01.2016 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
30 |
|
17.06.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.2015 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
14.04.2015 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2015 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2015 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.12.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
02.12.2014 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
26.11.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.11.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.11.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
26.11.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
26.11.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
26.11.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
01.10.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.09.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2014 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.07.2014 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2014 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.07.2014 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
16.07.2014 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2014 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2014 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2014 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.07.2014 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.06.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
35 |
|
09.05.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
09.05.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
05.05.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.05.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.05.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.05.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.05.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.05.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.05.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.05.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.05.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.05.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.05.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.05.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.05.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.05.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.05.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.05.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.05.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.05.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.05.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.05.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.05.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.05.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.05.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.05.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.05.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.05.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.05.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.05.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.05.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.05.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.05.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.05.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.05.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.05.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.05.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.03.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.03.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.03.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2014 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.02.2014 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2014 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2014 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2014 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.01.2014 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2014 |
Notification of termination of representative's authorisation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.01.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2014 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.01.2014 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.01.2014 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.01.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.04.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.04.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.04.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.04.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.04.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.04.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.04.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.04.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.04.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.04.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.04.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.04.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.04.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.04.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.04.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.04.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.11.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
15 |
|
02.11.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
15 |
|
06.07.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.06.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.06.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.06.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.06.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.06.2011 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.06.2011 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.06.2011 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.06.2011 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.06.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.06.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
05.04.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
13 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
14 |
|
24.01.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.04.2010 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.04.2010 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.04.2010 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.04.2010 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.04.2010 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.04.2010 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.04.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.04.2010 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
01.03.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2009 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
21 |
|
11.09.2009 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.09.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
11.09.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
11.09.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
11.09.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
11.09.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
11.09.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
11.09.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
11.09.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
11.09.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.09.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
11.09.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
03.09.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
03.09.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
180 |
|
06.11.2008 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.10.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2008 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.10.2008 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.10.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.08.2008 |
Final instructions (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.06.2008 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2008 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.06.2008 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
08.05.2008 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.10.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2007 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.10.2007 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.10.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.10.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.10.2007 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.09.2007 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2007 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2007 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.05.2007 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.05.2007 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
27.03.2007 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.03.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
27.03.2007 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2007 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2007 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.03.2007 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |