EP1855355 - Connection and switch device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weidmüller Interface GmbH & Co. KG Klingenbergstrasse 16 32758 Detmold / DE | [2007/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Niggemann, Matthias / Steinberg 9 32694, Dörentrup / DE | 02 /
Fehling, Stefan / Hans-Hüls-Str. 6 32791, Lage / DE | 03 /
Hanning, Walter / Am Langen Grund 66 32758, Detmold / DE | 04 /
Schild, Wolfgang / Wagnerstr. 12 32049, Herford / DE | [2012/20] |
Former [2007/46] | 01 /
Niggemann, Matthias Steinberg 9 32694, Dörentrup / DE | ||
02 /
Fehling, Stefan Hans-Hüls-Str. 6 32791, Lage / DE | |||
03 /
Hanning, Walter Am Langen Grund 66 32758, Detmold / DE | |||
04 /
Schild, Wolfgang Wagnerstr. 12 32049, Herford / DE | Representative(s) | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [2012/20] |
Former [2008/33] | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | ||
Former [2007/46] | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 07105627.9 | 04.04.2007 | [2007/46] | Priority number, date | DE20062006626U | 26.04.2006 Original published format: DE 202006006626 U | [2007/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1855355 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1855355 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | [2008/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1855355 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01R9/24, H01R13/629 | [2007/46] | CPC: |
H01R9/2491 (EP,US);
H01R13/629 (EP,US);
H01R13/71 (EP,US);
H01R2201/20 (EP,US);
H01R9/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/46] | Title | German: | Verbindungs- und Schaltvorrichtung | [2007/46] | English: | Connection and switch device | [2007/46] | French: | Dispositif de connexion et de commutation | [2007/46] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/36] | 25.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.08.2008 | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.04.2007 | CY | 16.05.2012 | CZ | 16.05.2012 | DK | 16.05.2012 | EE | 16.05.2012 | FI | 16.05.2012 | LT | 16.05.2012 | LV | 16.05.2012 | MC | 16.05.2012 | MT | 16.05.2012 | PL | 16.05.2012 | RO | 16.05.2012 | SE | 16.05.2012 | SI | 16.05.2012 | SK | 16.05.2012 | TR | 16.05.2012 | BG | 16.08.2012 | GR | 17.08.2012 | ES | 27.08.2012 | IS | 16.09.2012 | PT | 17.09.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
MC | 16.05.2012 | ||
MT | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
TR | 16.05.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
ES | 27.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
MC | 16.05.2012 | ||
MT | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
ES | 27.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/01] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
MC | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
ES | 27.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
ES | 27.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
ES | 27.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 16.05.2012 | |
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 16.05.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4477701 (CASTONGUAY ROGER N [US], et al) [Y] 2,8-10,15 * abstract * * column 2, line 36 - column 3, line 19 * * column 4, lines 9-29 * * figures 1-4 *; | [Y]DE3321497 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 18 * abstract * * page 13, line 8 - page 19, line 3 ** figures 5,7 *; | [XY]EP0253170 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,4,5,17 * abstract * * column 3, lines 15-40; figures 1,2,4,5 * [Y] 18; | [XY]US5434369 (TEMPCO DALE A [US], et al) [X] 1,3-7,11-14,16 * abstract * * column 5, line 4 - column 7, line 61 * * column 8, line 64 - column 9, line 58 * * figures 1-4,10,11 * [Y] 2,8-10,15 |