EP1811269 - Navigation device and method for displaying alternative routes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.02.2012 [2012/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TomTom International B.V. IP Creation Rembrandtplein 35 1017 CT Amsterdam / NL | [2012/03] |
Former [2007/30] | For all designated states TomTom International B.V. Rembrandtplein 35 1017 CT Amsterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pinkus, Ayal TomTom International B.V. Rembrandtplein 35 1017 CT, Amsterdam / NL | 02 /
Jurgens, Sven-Erik TomTom International B.V. Rembrandtplein 35 1017 CT, Amsterdam / NL | 03 /
Neef, Edwin TomTom International B.V. Rembrandtplein 35 1017 CT, Amsterdam / NL | 04 /
Gretton, Mark TomTom Software Ltd. 169 Euston Road London, NW1 2AE / GB | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/41] | 01 /
Pinkus, Ayal TomTom International B.V. Rembrandtplein 35 1017 CT, Amsterdam / NL | ||
02 /
Jurgens, Sven-Erik TomTom International B.V. Rembrandtplein 35 1017 CT, Amsterdam / NL | |||
03 /
Neef, Edwin TomTom International B.V. Rembrandtplein 35 1017 CT, Amsterdam / NL | |||
04 /
Gretton, Mark TomTom International B.V. 5 Huntsworth Mews London, NW1 6DE / GB | |||
Former [2007/30] | 01 /
PINKUS, Ayal TomTom International B.V. Rembrandtplein 35 1017 CT, Amsterdam / NL | ||
02 /
JURGENS, Sven-Erik TomTom International B.V. Rembrandtplein 35 1017 CT, Amsterdam / NL | |||
03 /
NEEF, Edwin TomTom International B.V. Rembrandtplein 35 1017 CT, Amsterdam / NL | |||
04 /
GRETTON, Mark TomTom International B.V. 5 Huntsworth Mews London, NW1 6DE / GB | Representative(s) | Moore, Nicholas TomTom International BV Oosterdoksstraat 114 1011 DK Amsterdam / NL | [2012/05] |
Former [2007/30] | Langley, Peter James Origin Limited, 52 Muswell Hill Road London N10 3JR / GB | Application number, filing date | 07105925.7 | 26.02.2004 | [2007/30] | Priority number, date | GB20030004358 | 26.02.2003 Original published format: GB 0304358 | GB20030005175 | 07.03.2003 Original published format: GB 0305175 | [2007/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1811269 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1811269 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | [2008/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/36 | [2007/30] | CPC: |
G06F3/04886 (EP,US);
G01C21/34 (GB);
G01C21/36 (GB);
G01C21/362 (EP,US);
G06F1/1626 (EP,GB,US);
G06F3/04817 (EP,US);
G06F3/0482 (EP,US);
G06Q10/02 (EP,US);
G08G1/0969 (GB);
G08G1/137 (GB)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/30] | Title | German: | Navigationsvorrichtung und Verfahren zum Anzeigen alternativer Routen | [2007/30] | English: | Navigation device and method for displaying alternative routes | [2007/30] | French: | Dispositif de navigation et procédé pour afficher des routes alternatives | [2007/30] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 08.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 17.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/06] | 23.01.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04714853.1 / EP1611416 | Divisional application(s) | EP10186234.0 / EP2264405 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040714853) is 11.01.2006 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 05.03.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 05.03.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.03.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5243528 (LEFEBVRE REBECCA K [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 61 - line 65 ** column 4, line 62 - column 5, line 63; figure 2 *; | [Y]US5859628 (ROSS MONTE [US], et al) [Y] 1-16 * column 2, line 30 - line 43 * * column 9, line 57 - line 65; figure - *; | [A]US5877751 (KANEMITSU HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 2 * * sentence 41 - sentence 48 * * column 13, line 48 - line 57 * * column 15, line 29 - line 50; figures 26,27,31 *; | [Y]US5928307 (OSHIZAWA HIDEKAZU [US], et al) [Y] 1-16 * column 4, line 15 - line 36 * * column 5, line 61 - line 64; figure - * | Examination | US2002011951 | by applicant | US5859628 | DE19753742 |