EP1853058 - Apparatus and method for upgrading codec [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/38] |
Former [2007/45] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Seoul 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ko, Jae-woo 201-1206 Daewoo Apt., Pureun Maeul Indeokwon Poil-dong, Uiwang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kwon, Hee-min 492-27 Pyeongchang-dong Jongno-gu Seoul / KR | 03 /
Kim, Jun-hyeong 106-1501 Samsung Raemian Apt., Bisan 1-dong Dongan-gu, Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Choo, Joung-hoon 131-1504 Gwanak Dreamtown, Bongcheon 5-dong Gwanak-gu, Seoul / KR | 05 /
Park, Sang-do 103-702 Samsung Raemian Apt., Yeoksam 2-dong Gangnam-gu, Seoul / KR | 06 /
Yoon, Jung-min 103-604 SK View Apt., Sindorim-dong, Guro-gu Seoul / KR | [2007/45] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Davies, Robert Ean Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | ||
Former [2007/45] | Davies, Robert Ean Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Yorkshire Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 07106913.2 | 25.04.2007 | [2007/45] | Priority number, date | KR20060040044 | 03.05.2006 Original published format: KR 20060040044 | [2007/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1853058 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1853058 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | [2008/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/235, H04N21/434, H04N21/435, H04N21/436, H04N21/458, H04N21/81, H04N21/84 | [2019/51] | CPC: |
H04N21/8193 (EP,US);
H04N21/235 (EP,US);
H04N21/434 (EP,US);
H04N21/4348 (EP,US);
H04N21/435 (EP,US);
H04N21/43615 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/45] | H04N5/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2009/24] |
Former [2007/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Codec-Aktualisierung | [2007/45] | English: | Apparatus and method for upgrading codec | [2007/45] | French: | Appareil et procédé pour la mise à jour de codecs | [2007/45] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/45] | 18.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/46] | 24.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.11.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2020 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0889645 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 3,4,8,9,16,17 * column 4, line 3 - line 27 * * column 4, line 36 - line 54 * * column 5, line 2 - line 34 * * column 6, line 15 - line 19 * * column 6, line 32 - line 53 * * column 8, line 40 - column 9, line 9 * * column 16, line 1 - line 15 * * figures 1,2,44b *; | [Y]EP0993183 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 6,13,19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0009] - [0016] , [0034] , [0035] , [0038] , [0039] * * figure 3 *; | [X]US6314565 (KENNER BRIAN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,14 * figures 1,2 * * column 1, line 9 - line 15 * * column 2, line 40 - line 63 * * column 4, line 44 - column 5, line 7 * * column 6, line 26 - line 29 * * column 6, line 40 - line 55 * * column 7, line 1 - line 16 * * column 8, line 30 - line 32 * * claims 11,15,16,22-24 *; | [Y]US2002120885 (CHOI JONG SUNG [KR], et al) [Y] 5,12,15,18 * abstract * * figures 1,3,4 * * paragraphs [0007] , [0010] , [0011] , [0021] , [0023] , [0025] , [0030] , [0032] , [0037] , [0038] , [0046] * * claims 1,15,18,20,26,28,30,31 *; | [A]US6570926 (AGRAWAL PRATHIMA [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * figures 7-12 * * column 1, line 14 - line 18 * * column 2, line 3 - line 13 * * column 3, line 39 - line 61 * * column 9, line 46 - line 50 * * column 9, line 57 - line 65 ** claims 1,5,7,10,13 *; | [XY]WO2004031949 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,7,14 * abstract * * page 1, line 25 - page 3, line 31 * * page 4, line 19 - page 5, line 14 * * page 6, line 5 - line 9 * * page 6, line 31 - page 7, line 4 * * page 7, line 14 - line 19 * * page 7, line 32 - line 34 * * page 9, line 24 - line 34 * * page 10, line 3 - line 6 * * page 10, line 29 - page 12, line 12 * * page 14, line 11 - line 31 * * claims 1,10 * * figures 1,2,4 * [Y] 3-6,8-13,15-19; | [Y]US2004083471 (NAM YOUN HO [KR], et al) [Y] 10,11 * abstract * * figures 3,5,7 * * paragraphs [0015] , [0016] , [0018] - [0020] * | Examination | KR20040082512 | EP1624692 | by applicant | JP2002149536 |