|
24.09.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.09.2018 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.09.2018 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.09.2018 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.2018 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
14.09.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2018 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2018 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2018 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.06.2018 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2018 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.2018 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.05.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
19.01.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.01.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.01.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.01.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.01.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.01.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.01.2018 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.01.2018 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2016 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2016 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
13.01.2016 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2016 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2015 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2015 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.2015 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
17.08.2015 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
21 |
|
20.07.2015 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Request concerning representative opponent |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.06.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.2015 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.06.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.2015 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.06.2015 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.06.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2015 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.02.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.11.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.09.2014 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.09.2014 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.09.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.09.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2014 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
20.01.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2014 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
13.11.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2013 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.2013 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.2013 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2013 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.06.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
05.06.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
05.06.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
05.06.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
05.06.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
05.06.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.06.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
34 |
|
05.09.2012 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2012 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.07.2012 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.07.2012 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.07.2012 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.07.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.03.2012 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.03.2012 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2012 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
28.06.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.04.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.04.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2010 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2010 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.02.2010 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
25.06.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2009 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2009 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.06.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.06.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.06.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.06.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.04.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2008 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2008 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2008 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.01.2008 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2008 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.01.2008 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.2007 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2007 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
28.06.2007 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.06.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
28.06.2007 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2007 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2007 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.06.2007 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |