blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Dates prévues pour la maintenance

Interruptions régulières:
entre 5 h 00 et 5 h 15 HEC, du lundi au dimanche.

Autres interruptions
Accessibilité

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

Flash Info

La Lettonie participe au Registre fédéré
Cliquez ici pour plus d'informations sur le Registre fédéré.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1894771

EP1894771 - Siège auto pour enfant pivotant entre une position d'utilisation et au moins une position d'installation, à gâchette [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.10.2010
Database last updated on 05.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip01.10.2010No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.11.2010  [2010/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dorel France SA
Z.I., 9 Blvd. du Poitou BP 905
49309 Cholet Cedex / FR
[2009/48]
Former [2008/10]For all designated states
DOREL FRANCE SA
Z.I., 9 Blvd. du Poitou BP 905
49309 Cholet Cedex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Lhomme, Gilles
5 rue du Général Joubert
85180 Château d'Olonne / FR
02 / Biaud, Richard
38 rue du Bocage
49340 Trementines / FR
 [2008/10]
Representative(s)Bioret, Ludovic
Cabinet Vidon
16 B, rue de Jouanet - B.P. 90333
35703 Rennes Cedex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/10]Bioret, Ludovic
Cabinet Vidon 16 B, rue de Jouanet - B.P. 90333
35703 Rennes Cedex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date07115318.330.08.2007
[2008/10]
Priority number, dateFR2006000770701.09.2006         Original published format: FR 0607707
[2008/10]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1894771
Date:05.03.2008
Language:FR
[2008/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1894771
Date:25.11.2009
Language:FR
[2009/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.12.2007
ClassificationIPC:B60N2/28
[2008/10]
CPC:
B60N2/2821 (EP,US); B60N2/2869 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2008/46]
Former [2008/10]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kraftfahrzeugsitz für ein Kind, drehbar zwischen einer Gebrauchsposition und mindestens einer Einstiegposition, mit einem Auslöser[2008/10]
English:Automotive seat for a child pivotable between a use position and at least one access position, with a trigger[2008/10]
French:Siège auto pour enfant pivotant entre une position d'utilisation et au moins une position d'installation, à gâchette[2008/10]
Examination procedure14.03.2008Examination requested  [2008/17]
11.04.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.06.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.09.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
17.09.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.10.2008Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
13.03.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.09.2009Fee for grant paid
11.09.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.08.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1110807  (COMBI CO [JP]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0052]; figures 1-5,9-11 *;
 [A]US6773065  (STAMPER LAURA [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * column 5, line 28 - line 34 * * column 6, line 51 - column 7, line 14; figures 2-4,7 *;
 [AD]EP1625968  (DOREL FRANCE SA [FR]) [AD] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0064]; figures 1-4 *;
 [AD]EP1625967  (DOREL FRANCE SA [FR]) [AD] 1,11,12 * abstract ** paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0045]; figures 1,2 *
by applicantEP1625968
 EP1625967
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.