EP1909387 - Conversion circuit for converting differential signal into single-phase signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.12.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.02.2012 [2012/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/15] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arai, Tomoyuki c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2008/15] | Representative(s) | Stebbing, Timothy Charles Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/15] | Stebbing, Timothy Charles Haseltine Lake 5th Floor Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London, WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07116590.6 | 17.09.2007 | [2008/15] | Priority number, date | JP20060261183 | 26.09.2006 Original published format: JP 2006261183 | [2008/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1909387 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H03F3/45 | [2008/15] | CPC: |
H03F3/45 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/51] |
Former [2008/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Wandlerschaltung zur Umwandlung eines Differentialsignals in ein Einzelphasensignal | [2008/15] | English: | Conversion circuit for converting differential signal into single-phase signal | [2008/15] | French: | Circuit de conversion pour convertir un signal différentiel en un signal à phase unique | [2008/15] | Examination procedure | 08.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/47] | 09.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.11.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 29.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/05] | 14.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/05] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.03.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3872323 (FREDERIKSEN THOMAS M, et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US4835489 (MONTICELLI DENNIS M [US]) [A] 1,10,11* column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 30 *; | [A]US5406219 (LOU PERRY W [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0042703 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003013419 (RAZAVI BEHZAD [US], et al) [A] 1,10,11 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0030]; figure 2 *; | [A]US2004169550 (PERRIER STEPHANE [FR], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0013] - paragraphs [0024] , [0025]; figures 3,5 *; | [A]JP2005184628 (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]EP1575161 (ST MICROELECTRONICS SA [FR]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0033]; figures 3,4 * |