EP1890130 - Sensor platform for the parallel detection of a plurality of analytes using evanescently excited luminescenes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/08] | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neuschäfer, Dieter Lutzertstrasse 40 4132, Muttenz / CH | 02 /
Duveneck, Gert, Ludwig Ezmattemweg 34 79189, Bad Krozingen / DE | 03 /
Pawlak, Michael Andelsbachstrasse 5 79725, Laufenburg / DE | 04 /
Pieles, Uwe Im Spitzgarten 13 79418, Schliengen / DE | 05 /
Budach, Wolfgang Route de Bel-Air 26 1723, Marly / CH | [2008/08] | Representative(s) | Lütjens, Henning, et al Bayer Business Services GmbH Law and Patents Patents and Licensing 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Lütjens, Henning, et al Bayer Business Services GmbH Law and Patents Patents and Licensing 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2009/44] | Lütjens, Henning, et al Bayer Business Services GmbH Law and Patents Patents and Licensing 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2008/52] | Pommerenke, Alexander, et al Solvias AG Patents WRO-1078.P46 Mattenstrasse 22 4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2008/43] | Maué, Paul Georg Solvias AG Patents WRO-1060.P46 Mattenstrasse 22 4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2008/08] | Maué, Paul Georg Solvias AG Patents Erlenstrasse 1 4058 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 07118702.5 | 02.05.1996 | [2008/08] | Priority number, date | CH19950001396 | 12.05.1995 Original published format: CH 139695 | [2008/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1890130 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1890130 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | [2008/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/55, G01N21/77, G01N21/64 | [2008/08] | CPC: |
G01N21/648 (EP,US);
G01N21/77 (KR);
G01N21/6452 (EP,US);
G01N21/7703 (EP,US);
G01N2021/0346 (EP,US);
G01N2021/7786 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2011/03] |
Former [2008/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Sensorenplattform zur parallelen Erkennung mehrerer Analyte mittels sehr schwach leuchtender Lumineszenzen | [2008/08] | English: | Sensor platform for the parallel detection of a plurality of analytes using evanescently excited luminescenes | [2008/08] | French: | Plate-forme de capteur pour la détection parallèle d'une pluralité d'analytes utilisant des éléments luminescents à excitation évanescente | [2008/08] | Examination procedure | 20.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 23.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/45] | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/45] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96914164.7 / EP0824684 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19960914164) is 30.11.2000 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 17.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 17.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 27.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 16.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 04.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 20 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]WO9110122 (BATTELLE DEVELOPMENT CORP [US], et al) [XD] 1,3,4,6-8,10-13,15,18 * page 3, line 1 - line 8 * * page 5, line 18 - line 27 * * page 14, line 14 - line 21 * * page 18, line 6 - line 35 * * page 20, line 3 - line 14 * * page 28, line 24 - page 29, line 10; figure 5 *; | [Y]US5081012 (FLANAGAN MICHAEL T [GB], et al) [Y] 1-13,15,16,18 * column 6, line 42 - column 7, line 20; figure 8; claims 2,10 *; | [Y]WO9214177 (FIBERCHEM INC [US]) [Y] 1,3,4,6-8,11,12 * abstract * * page 2, line 32 - page 3, line 8 * * page 9, line 24 - page 10, line 23 * * page 13, line 6 - line 12 * * page 14, line 9 - line 15; figures 3B,6B,6C *; | [A]US5163118 (LORENZO JOSEPH P [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * column 6, line 37 - column 7, line 37; figures 5A,5C *; | [AD]WO9503538 (BALZERS HOCHVAKUUM [LI], et al) [AD] 1-19 * page 2, line 19 - page 3, line 29 * * page 11, line 8 - line 24; figure 7 *; | [YD] - KUNZ R E ET AL, "GRATING COUPLERS IN TAPERED WAVEGUIDES FOR INTEGRATED OPTICAL SENSING", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, VA, US, (1994), vol. 2068, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 313 - 325, XP000600363 [YD] 1-13,15,16,18 * page 315 * * page 318 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.170679 | [A] - SUTHERLAND R M ET AL, "OPTICAL DETECTION OF ANTIBODY-ANTIGEN REACTIONS AT A GLASS-LIQUID INTERFACE", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (198401), vol. 30, no. 9, ISSN 0009-9147, pages 1533 - 1538, XP002011984 [A] 1-19 * abstract * | [A] - GALE M T ET AL, "POLYMER AND III-V TRANSDUCER PLATFORMS FOR INTEGRATED OPTICAL SENSORS", OPTICAL ENGINEERING, SOC. OF PHOTO-OPTICAL INSTRUMENTATION ENGINEERS. BELLINGHAM, US, (19950801), vol. 34, no. 8, ISSN 0091-3286, pages 2396 - 2406, XP000518235 [A] 1-19 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.205664 |