EP1933056 - Wear indicator element for the friction lining of an automobile and wear indicator including such an element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2010 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE PLASTIC OMNIUM 19, avenue Jules Carteret 69007 Lyon / FR | [2008/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Delvenne, Corinne 15 rue Saint Didier 52200 Langres / FR | 02 /
Pionnier, Jérôme 25 rue Victor Hugo 52800 Nogent / FR | 03 /
Agnus, Bruno 22 rue des Noyers 52600 Chaudenay / FR | [2008/25] | Representative(s) | Remy, Vincent Noel Paul, et al LLR 11 boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/25] | Remy, Vincent Noel Paul, et al Cabinet Lhermet La Bigne & Remy 11 Boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07123056.9 | 12.12.2007 | [2008/25] | Priority number, date | FR20060055479 | 13.12.2006 Original published format: FR 0655479 | [2008/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1933056 | Date: | 18.06.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1933056 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16D66/02 | [2008/25] | CPC: |
F16D66/027 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/25] | Title | German: | Körper der Verschleissanzeige eines Kraftfahrzeug-Reibbelags und Verschleissanzeige, die einen solchen Körper umfasst | [2008/25] | English: | Wear indicator element for the friction lining of an automobile and wear indicator including such an element | [2008/25] | French: | Corps de témoin d'usure de garniture de friction de véhicule automobile et témoin d'usure comprenant un tel corps | [2008/25] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/05] | 27.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.09.2009 | CY | 09.09.2009 | CZ | 09.09.2009 | DK | 09.09.2009 | EE | 09.09.2009 | FI | 09.09.2009 | IE | 09.09.2009 | IT | 09.09.2009 | LT | 09.09.2009 | LV | 09.09.2009 | MT | 09.09.2009 | NL | 09.09.2009 | PL | 09.09.2009 | RO | 09.09.2009 | SE | 09.09.2009 | SI | 09.09.2009 | SK | 09.09.2009 | TR | 09.09.2009 | GR | 10.12.2009 | LU | 12.12.2009 | ES | 20.12.2009 | BE | 31.12.2009 | BG | 31.12.2009 | IS | 09.01.2010 | PT | 11.01.2010 | HU | 10.03.2010 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
IT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
MT | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
LU | 12.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
BG | 31.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
HU | 10.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
IT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
MT | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
LU | 12.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
BG | 31.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
IT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
BG | 31.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/43] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/27] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2485133 (VALEO [FR]) [A] 1,8 * page 6, line 3 - page 7, line 13; figures 3-9 *; | [A]DE4036400 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [A] 1,8* the whole document *; | [A]EP0536006 (BENDIX EUROP SERVICES TECH [FR]) [A] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [A]DE20014875U (PEX KABELTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,8 * page 7, line 5 - page 8, line 2; figures 1a-2b * |