EP1832901 - Security film [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.08.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CPFilms Inc. 4210 The Great Road Fieldale, VA 24089 / US | [2007/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Port, Anthony Brian 77 Ferndale Court Collinsville Virginia 24078 / US | 02 /
Newbitt, David 15 Hann Road Rowhams Southampton Hampshire SO16 8LN / GB | [2007/37] | Representative(s) | Stanley, Michael Gordon Michael Stanley & Co. P.O. Box 270 Banbury Oxfordshire OX15 5YY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/37] | Stanley, Michael Gordon Michael Stanley & Co., P.O. Box 270 Banbury Oxfordshire OX15 5YY / GB | Application number, filing date | 07250935.9 | 06.03.2007 | [2007/37] | Priority number, date | US20060780765P | 09.03.2006 Original published format: US 780765 P | [2007/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1832901 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/30, // G02B5/22 | [2007/37] | CPC: |
B42D25/328 (EP,US);
B42D25/351 (EP);
B42D25/355 (EP);
B42D25/373 (EP,US);
B42D25/45 (EP);
G02B5/223 (EP);
G02B5/3016 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/21] |
Former [2007/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Sicherheitsfilm | [2007/37] | English: | Security film | [2007/37] | French: | Film de sécurité | [2007/37] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/38] | 22.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/38] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2006007742 (ROLIC AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-18 * figure 8 * * page 16, line 19 - page 17, line 3 *; | [A]WO02085642 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-18 * page 10, line 36 - page 11, line 4 *; | [A]EP1628147 (NHK SPRING CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-18 * example 1 *; | [AD]US6221112 (SNIDER WILLIAM DOUGLAS [GB]) [AD] 1-18 * the whole document * |