EP1878476 - Pendulous exercise device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Precor Incorporated 20031 142nd Avenue NE P.O. Box 7202 Woodinville, WA 98072-4002 / US | [2008/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arnold, Peter J. 12223-185th Avenue SE Snohomish, WA 98290 / US | [2008/03] | Representative(s) | Naismith, Robert Stewart, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Naismith, Robert Stewart, et al Marks & Clerk Scotland 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow, G1 3AE Scotland / GB | ||
Former [2008/03] | Naismith, Robert Stewart, et al Marks & Clerk 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow, G1 3AE Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 07251004.3 | 10.03.2007 | [2008/03] | Priority number, date | US20060487212 | 14.07.2006 Original published format: US 487212 | [2008/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1878476 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1878476 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A63B69/00, A63B69/18, A63B23/04 | [2008/03] | CPC: |
A63B23/0488 (EP,US);
A63B22/001 (EP,US);
A63B22/0069 (EP,US);
A63B2022/0038 (EP,US);
A63B2022/0041 (EP,US);
A63B2022/0043 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/39] |
Former [2008/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Pendelübungsgerät | [2008/03] | English: | Pendulous exercise device | [2008/03] | French: | Dispositif d'exercice pendulaire | [2008/03] | Examination procedure | 23.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/23] | 30.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.05.2008 | Opposition(s) | 23.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 22.06.2011 | [2012/24] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2005107889 (SKATESTRIDER INC [CA], et al) [X] 1-15,17,24-39 * page 20, lines 4-33 - page 21, lines 1-33; figure - * * page 22, lines 1-18 - page 27, line 4 * [Y] 16,18-23,40-57; | [YA]US6036622 (GORDON JOEL D [US]) [Y] 18-23,40-57 * column 3, lines 45-67 - column 4, lines 1-32 * * column 6, lines 14-61; figure - * [A] 1-17,24-39; | [YA]WO9928001 (STAIRMASTER SPORTS MED PROD [US], et al) [Y] 16 * page 3, lines 1-34 - page 4, lines 1-8 * * page 22, lines 3-22; figure - * [A] 1-15,17-57; | [A]US5792028 (JARVIE JOHN E [US]) [A] 1-57 * column 1, lines 53-67 - column 2, lines 1-67; figure - *; | [A]WO9939779 (GORDON TRACE O [US]) [A] 1-57 * page 3, lines 1-34 - page 4, column 2, lines 1-34; figure - * * page 5, lines 1-23 * |