|
10.10.2018 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.10.2017 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.10.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.2017 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.07.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2017 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
47 |
|
16.02.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.01.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.11.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.11.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.11.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2016 |
Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.09.2016 |
Communication concerning deficiencies in subsequently filed documents |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.2016 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
08.09.2016 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
24 |
|
08.09.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.07.2016 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.06.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.2016 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.06.2016 |
General authorisation |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.06.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.06.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.06.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.06.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.06.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.06.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.06.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.06.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.06.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.06.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.06.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.06.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.06.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.06.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.06.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.06.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.06.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.06.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
13.05.2016 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
13.04.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.04.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.03.2016 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.09.2015 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2014 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.2012 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.04.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.04.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
21.04.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
21.04.2011 |
Description |
Appeal |
9 |
|
21.04.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
18.02.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.12.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2010 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.12.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.12.2010 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.12.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.12.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.12.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.12.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.12.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.11.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2010 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.2010 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2010 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.11.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
12.11.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
12.11.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
11.05.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.04.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.04.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.04.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.03.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.03.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.09.2008 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2008 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.03.2008 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2008 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.03.2008 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.02.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2008 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2008 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
31.10.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
51 |
|
05.09.2007 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.08.2007 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2007 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2007 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2007 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2007 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.07.2007 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2007 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2007 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
51 |
|
30.03.2007 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.03.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
45 |
|
30.03.2007 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2007 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.03.2007 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |