EP1852243 - Material delivery tension and tracking system for use in solid imaging [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3D Systems, Inc. 333 Three D Systems Circle Rock Hill, SC 29730 / US | [2007/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sperry, Charles R. 324 Audubon Road Leeds, MA 01053 / US | 02 /
Scott, Suzanne M. 566 Chester Road Springfield, VT 05156 / US | 03 /
McNamara, Dennis F. 151 Morways Park Charlestown, NH 03603 / US | [2007/45] | Representative(s) | Hess, Peter K. G., et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/32] | Hess, Peter K. G., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/04] | Turnbull, Alexander James, et al HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [2007/50] | Waldren, Robin Michael, et al Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | ||
Former [2007/45] | Howe, Steven Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 07251785.7 | 27.04.2007 | [2007/45] | Priority number, date | US20060416812 | 03.05.2006 Original published format: US 416812 | [2007/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1852243 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1852243 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | [2010/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1852243 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B29C67/00, B05C5/02, B65G23/44 | [2010/23] | CPC: |
B29C64/135 (EP,US);
B33Y30/00 (EP,US);
B33Y10/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/45] | B29C67/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2011/07] |
Former [2007/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Spannungs- und Verfolgungs -system für Materialausgabe zur Verwendung in der Festkörperbildgebung | [2011/20] | English: | Material delivery tension and tracking system for use in solid imaging | [2007/45] | French: | Système de tension et de suivi d'un moyen de livraison de matériau à utiliser dans l'imagerie solide | [2011/20] |
Former [2007/45] | Materialausgabespannung und Verfolgungssystem zur Verwendung in der Festkörperbildgebung | ||
Former [2007/45] | Tension de livraison de matériau et système de suivi à utiliser pour l'imagerie uniforme | Examination procedure | 10.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/43] | 10.12.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.01.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19957370 (FRUTH CARL JOHANNES [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 9, lines 66-68 - column 10, lines 1-2 * * figure 6 * * claim 10 *; | [A]US2005019499 (TOMARU MIKIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 1, paragraph 0017 * * figure 8 *; | [A]US5186313 (DENKER STANLEY D [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 2, lines 1-3 * * figure 2 * |